This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/17/2021 at 21:45:51 (UTC).

KATHRYN MCCURDY VS HRAYR SHAHINIAN MD ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/19/2017 KATHRYN MCCURDY filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against HRAYR SHAHINIAN MD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PATRICIA D. NIETO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5651

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PATRICIA D. NIETO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

MCCURDY KATHRYN

Respondents and Defendants

SKULL BASE INSTITUTE

SKULL BASE MEDICAL GROUP INC

DOES 1 TO 20

MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

SHAHINIAN HRAYR M.D.

SKULL BASE FOUNDATION

SKULL BAE MEDICAL GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

QUINN KEVIN F.

QUINN KEVIN FREDERICK

Defendant Attorney

MCANDREWS THOMAS FRANCIS

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-03-22 00:00:00

3/22/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-03-22 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ORDER

5/9/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: ORDER

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/7/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-06-11 00:00:00

6/11/2018: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2018-06-11 00:00:00

Request for Dismissal

3/12/2019: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement -

7/18/2018: Case Management Statement -

Case Management Statement -

7/18/2018: Case Management Statement -

Minute Order -

9/20/2018: Minute Order -

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/26/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

10/31/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

DEFENDANT HRAYR SHAHINIAN, M.D.'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

3/20/2018: DEFENDANT HRAYR SHAHINIAN, M.D.'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEFENDANT HRAYR SHAHINIAN, M.D'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/20/2018: DEFENDANT HRAYR SHAHINIAN, M.D'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/17/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Minute Order -

5/9/2018: Minute Order -

Case Management Statement -

7/18/2018: Case Management Statement -

Stipulation and Order -

8/1/2018: Stipulation and Order -

SUMMONS -

6/19/2017: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE; ETC

6/19/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE; ETC

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Kathryn McCurdy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department T; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Advanced-This date & continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department U; (Order ReRelated Cases; Order-Court) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-09-20 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Defendant & Defendant in Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT HRAYR SHAHINIAN, M.D'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hrayr Shahinian, M.D. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketDEFENDANT HRAYR SHAHINIAN, M.D.'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kathryn McCurdy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kathryn McCurdy (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES: (1) MEDICAL NEGLIGENCE; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SKULL BASE FOUNDATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SKULL BASE MEDICAL GROUP INC. is a litigant