This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/10/2022 at 09:43:31 (UTC).

KATHRYN LIMAS VS SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 KATHRYN LIMAS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5280

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LIMAS KATHRYN

Defendants

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY AS TRUSTEE FOR MORGAN STANLEY ABS CAPITAL I INC. TRUST 2005-HE7 MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES SERIES 2005-HE7

SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING INC

THE WOLF FIRM P.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARA ANTHONY P.

Defendant Attorney

DAILEY STEVE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/13/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/13/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/13/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/13/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Dismissal

2/14/2022: Request for Dismissal

Request for Judicial Notice

1/12/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

1/12/2022: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

1/12/2022: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF STEVEN M. DAILEY

1/12/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF STEVEN M. DAILEY

Proof of Personal Service

12/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

12/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Kathryn Limas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC (Defendant); DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE FOR MORGAN STANLEY ABS CAPITAL I INC. TRUST 2005-HE7, MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2005-HE7 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (of Steven M. Dailey); Filed by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC (Defendant); DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE FOR MORGAN STANLEY ABS CAPITAL I INC. TRUST 2005-HE7, MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2005-HE7 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketRequest for Judicial Notice; Filed by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC (Defendant); DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE FOR MORGAN STANLEY ABS CAPITAL I INC. TRUST 2005-HE7, MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2005-HE7 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC (Defendant); DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, AS TRUSTEE FOR MORGAN STANLEY ABS CAPITAL I INC. TRUST 2005-HE7, MORTGAGE PASS-THROUGH CERTIFICATES, SERIES 2005-HE7 (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kathryn Limas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Kathryn Limas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kathryn Limas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kathryn Limas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kathryn Limas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kathryn Limas (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE WOLF FIRM is a litigant

Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as Trustee, in Trust for Registered Holders of Long Beach Mortgage Loan Trust 2006-6, Asset-backed Certificates, Series 2006-6 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARA ANTHONY P.