Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2019 at 14:06:31 (UTC).

KATHRYN KIRCHER VS CIRCULATING AIR INC

Case Summary

On 10/27/2017 KATHRYN KIRCHER filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CIRCULATING AIR INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR and JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR.. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1573

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR

JOHN SHEPARD WILEY JR.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

KIRCHER KATHRYN

Defendants and Respondents

CIRCULATING AIR INCORPORATION

DOES 1 TO 20

CIRCULATING AIR INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

HAQUE KASHIF ESQ.

KWAK SIMON ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

LITTLER MENDELSON P.C.

BLUMBERG ROBERT S.

 

Court Documents

Civil Deposit

1/3/2018: Civil Deposit

Notice of Appearance

1/3/2018: Notice of Appearance

Other -

4/16/2018: Other -

Minute Order

4/20/2018: Minute Order

Other -

5/2/2018: Other -

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/11/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Order

10/15/2018: Order

Minute Order

10/15/2018: Minute Order

Declaration

11/7/2018: Declaration

Unknown

11/13/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

11/13/2018: Minute Order

Supplemental Declaration

11/14/2018: Supplemental Declaration

Minute Order

12/14/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

12/13/2017: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Minute Order

11/14/2017: Minute Order

Order

11/14/2017: Order

SUMMONS

10/27/2017: SUMMONS

CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PAY MINIMUM WAGES; ETC

10/27/2017: CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PAY MINIMUM WAGES; ETC

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 9, John Shepard Wiley Jr., Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Supplemental Declaration (of Simon Kwak pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 3.770); Filed by KATHRYN KIRCHER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 9, John Shepard Wiley Jr., Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order) of 11/13/2018); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Minute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Declaration (of Simon Kwak Pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 3.770); Filed by KATHRYN KIRCHER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • Certificate (of Service); Filed by KATHRYN KIRCHER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 9, John Shepard Wiley Jr., Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-10-15 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2018
  • Notice of Appearance -DEFENDANT CIRCULATING AIR, INC.'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by KATHRYN KIRCHER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 311; (Order-Complex Determination; Case Determined to be Complex) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Order -INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-11-14 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Minute Order -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR: 1. FAILURE TO PAY MINIMUM WAGES; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by KATHRYN KIRCHER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CIRCULATING AIR INCORPORATION is a litigant