This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/17/2021 at 05:30:21 (UTC).

KATHRYN HART VS JOHN RAMIREZ

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 KATHRYN HART filed an Other lawsuit against JOHN RAMIREZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN P. PFAHLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0704

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN P. PFAHLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HART KATHRYN

Defendant

RAMIREZ JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANISMAN JENIFER

Defendant Attorney

KELLENER JOSEPH

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • Hearing11/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions against the Plaintiff for failure to appear on 10/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • Hearing11/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketRequest/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial; Filed by Kathryn Hart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by John Ramirez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by John Ramirez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by John Ramirez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration of Jenifer Anisman; Filed by Kathryn Hart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurr...) of 10/20/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketOpposition to Notice of Related Case; Filed by Kathryn Hart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Motion and Motion to Strike Portions of the Complaint); Filed by John Ramirez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((John Ramirez)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kathryn Hart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kathryn Hart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Cover Sheet and Allegations for Unlawful Detainer - Complaint; Filed by Kathryn Hart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kathryn Hart (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 21CHCV00704 Hearing Date: October 20, 2021 Dept: F49

Dept.\r\nF-49

\r\n\r\n

Date:\r\n10-20-21 (advanced from 12-29-21 via ex parte)

\r\n\r\n

Case\r\n# 21CHCV00704

\r\n\r\n

Trial\r\nDate: Not Set

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

STRIKE

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

MOVING\r\nPARTY: Defendant, John Ramirez

\r\n\r\n

RESPONDING\r\nPARTY: Plaintiff, Kathryn Hart

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

RELIEF\r\nREQUESTED:\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Motion\r\nto Strike the First Amended Complaint: Allegations in support of, and claim\r\nfor, punitive damages

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

SUMMARY\r\nOF ACTION

\r\n\r\n

On\r\nJune 1, 2011, Plaintiff Kathryn Hart entered into a residential lease for\r\ncertain premises with Defendant John Ramirez. Rent was set at $2,400. Plaintiff\r\nalleges Defendant John Ramirez breached the lease, and seeks $84,000 in past\r\ndue rent, plus damages for waste.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

On\r\nSeptember 15, 2021, Plaintiff filed a complaint for unlawful detainer.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

RECOMMENDED\r\nRULING:\r\nDenied

\r\n\r\n

Defendant\r\nJohn Ramirez moves to strike the complaint for unlawful detainer. Defendant\r\nmoves to strike on grounds that the claimed $84,000 rent deficiency lacks “any\r\nfactual or legal support in violation of the law.” Defendant also challenge the\r\ndamages claim as lacking support “as a matter of law” without any specific\r\narticulation.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Plaintiff\r\nin opposition counters that the motion to strike is improper as a party served\r\nwith an unlawful detainer may only respond via demurrer or answer. “On or before the day fixed for\r\nhis appearance, the defendant may appear and answer or demur.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 1170.)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

The court docket shows\r\nno reply at the time of the filing cutoff for the court posting of tentative\r\nrulings.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

The basis of the\r\ncomplaint or damages are not at issue in the subject motion. (Saberi v. Bakhtiari (1985)\r\n169 Cal.App.3d 509, 513.) The motion\r\nitself is therefore improper.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

The motion is denied.\r\nDefendant to answer within 5 days.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Plaintiff\r\nto give notice.

\r\n\r\n

'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLENER JOSEPH