This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/26/2022 at 05:59:41 (UTC).

KATHRIN MAGHEN VS UNITED RECOVERY AND REMARKETING, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/02/2021 KATHRIN MAGHEN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against UNITED RECOVERY AND REMARKETING, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAREN NELSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3907

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAREN NELSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MAGHEN KATHRIN

Defendants

STERLING ASSET RECOVERY INC.

UNITED RECOVERY AND REMARKETING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRUEBLOOD ALEXANDER

Defendant Attorneys

DOUGLASS MICHAEL C.

MALLON ANDREW J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/2/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT STERLING ASSET RECOVERY, INC.

3/4/2022: Notice of Appearance - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT STERLING ASSET RECOVERY, INC.

Initial Status Conference Order

2/15/2022: Initial Status Conference Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/15/2022, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

2/15/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/15/2022, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Answer - UNITED RECOVERY AND REMARKETING, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

1/31/2022: Answer - UNITED RECOVERY AND REMARKETING, LLC'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/23/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AND FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

3/23/2022: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AND FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2022
  • Hearing04/14/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 17 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Initial Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Initial Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (and Further Status Conference); Filed by Kathrin Maghen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Initial Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appearance (on Behalf of Defendant Sterling Asset Recovery, Inc.); Filed by Sterling Asset Recovery, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • Docketat 09:36 AM in Department 17, Maren Nelson, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 02/15/2022, Initial Status Conference Order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketInitial Status Conference Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketUnited Recovery and Remarketing, LLC's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Filed by United Recovery and Remarketing, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kathrin Maghen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kathrin Maghen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kathrin Maghen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kathrin Maghen (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STERLING ASSET RECOVERY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DOUGLASS MICHAEL C.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MALLON ANDREW J