This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 15:41:39 (UTC).

KATHLENE SUSAN HERRERA, ET AL. VS ROCHELLE STERLING, AS TRUSTEE OF THE STERLING FAMILY TRUST, AND DBA BEVERLY HILLS PROPERTIES INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/31/2019 KATHLENE SUSAN HERRERA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROCHELLE STERLING, AS TRUSTEE OF THE STERLING FAMILY TRUST, AND DBA BEVERLY HILLS PROPERTIES INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAIG D. KARLAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0201

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CRAIG D. KARLAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

POCKARD SCOTT

KINGSTON SUZANNE

CONWAY KELLY

PHILLIPS TEDDY S JR

KINYANJUI ROSE WAKESHO

HERRERA KATHLENE SUSAN

Defendant

ROCHELLE STERLING AS TRUSTEE OF THE STERLING FAMILY TRUST AND DBA BEVERLY HILLS PROPERTIES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ACKERMAN WHITNEY

AIVAZI ZHANA

Defendant Attorneys

TOUTANT LINDA MICHELE

GARBACZ GREG A

FINLEY KEVIN DAVID

CHIN ARCHIE

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

9/1/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Association of Attorney

6/28/2021: Association of Attorney

Stipulation and Order - [PROPOSED] FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

3/11/2021: Stipulation and Order - [PROPOSED] FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES]

3/12/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF TRIAL AND RELATED DATES]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

1/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Informal Discovery Conference

11/24/2020: Informal Discovery Conference

Informal Discovery Conference

10/19/2020: Informal Discovery Conference

Informal Discovery Conference

10/20/2020: Informal Discovery Conference

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING

8/14/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

8/11/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

4/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 04/24/2020

4/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 04/24/2020

Answer

2/14/2020: Answer

Case Management Statement

1/14/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING AND MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE

1/30/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING AND MEDIATION COMPLETION DATE

Answer

12/20/2019: Answer

Amended Complaint

11/5/2019: Amended Complaint

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • Hearing04/25/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • Hearing04/18/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • Hearing12/07/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department M at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Withdrawal of Association of Counsel); Filed by ROCHELLE STERLING, as trustee of the Sterling Family Trust, and dba BEVERLY HILLS PROPERTIES INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by ROCHELLE STERLING, as trustee of the Sterling Family Trust, and dba BEVERLY HILLS PROPERTIES INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department M; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department M; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Stipulation for Continuance of Trial and Related Dates]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketStipulation for Continuance of Trial and Related Dates; Filed by ROCHELLE STERLING, as trustee of the Sterling Family Trust, and dba BEVERLY HILLS PROPERTIES INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department M; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (of Kevin D. Finley in Support of Demurrer and Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Complaint); Filed by ROCHELLE STERLING, as trustee of the Sterling Family Trust, and dba BEVERLY HILLS PROPERTIES INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by ROCHELLE STERLING, as trustee of the Sterling Family Trust, and dba BEVERLY HILLS PROPERTIES INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Hearing on Demurrer to Plaintiffs' Complaint); Filed by ROCHELLE STERLING, as trustee of the Sterling Family Trust, and dba BEVERLY HILLS PROPERTIES INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by ROCHELLE STERLING, as trustee of the Sterling Family Trust, and dba BEVERLY HILLS PROPERTIES INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by ROCHELLE STERLING, as trustee of the Sterling Family Trust, and dba BEVERLY HILLS PROPERTIES INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by KATHLENE SUSAN HERRERA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by KATHLENE SUSAN HERRERA (Plaintiff); SUZANNE KINGSTON (Plaintiff); KELLY CONWAY (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by KATHLENE SUSAN HERRERA (Plaintiff); SUZANNE KINGSTON (Plaintiff); KELLY CONWAY (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KATHLENE SUSAN HERRERA (Plaintiff); SUZANNE KINGSTON (Plaintiff); KELLY CONWAY (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHIN ARCHIE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TOUTANT LINDA M

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FINLEY KEVIN D

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARBACZ GREGORY A. ESQ.