Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/24/2021 at 23:42:59 (UTC).

KATHLEEN SMITH, AN INDIVIDUAL VS THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR CAPITAL CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 KATHLEEN SMITH, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR CAPITAL CORPORATION, A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8920

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH AN INDIVIDUAL KATHLEEN

Defendants

STUDIO CITY SUBSIDIARY LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

BLACKROCK REALTY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

COMBINED PROPERTIES INCORPORATED A DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA CORPORATION

THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR CAPITAL CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WERBIN ANTHONY W.

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

5/19/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2024
  • Hearing05/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • Hearing11/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • Hearing11/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KATHLEEN SMITH, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by KATHLEEN SMITH, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by KATHLEEN SMITH, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STUDIO CITY SUBSIDIARY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COMBINED PROPERTIES INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR CORPORATION, is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WERBIN ANTHONY W.