This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2019 at 11:21:41 (UTC).

KATHERINE SANCERI VS BARBARA ANDERSON

Case Summary

On 09/05/2017 KATHERINE SANCERI filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against BARBARA ANDERSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BRIAN F. GASDIA, MARGARET MILLER BERNAL, MASTER CALENDAR, LORI ANN FOURNIER and PATRICK T. MEYERS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6546

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BRIAN F. GASDIA

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

MASTER CALENDAR

LORI ANN FOURNIER

PATRICK T. MEYERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SANCERI KATHERINE AN INDIVIDUAL

SANCERI KATHERINE

Defendant

ANDERSON BARBARA AN INDIIVDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

MANSOUR LAW GROUP APLC

MANSOUR JOHN

 

Court Documents

Order

6/4/2019: Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/5/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

9/5/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Legacy Document

11/6/2017: Legacy Document

Case Management Statement

2/6/2018: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/6/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Minute Order

2/14/2018: Minute Order

Other -

3/27/2018: Other -

Declaration

3/27/2018: Declaration

Legacy Document

3/27/2018: Legacy Document

Other -

3/27/2018: Other -

Other -

3/27/2018: Other -

Legacy Document

5/24/2018: Legacy Document

Legacy Document

5/24/2018: Legacy Document

Minute Order

7/12/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/4/2018: Minute Order

Proof of Personal Service

1/15/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Case Management Statement

2/15/2019: Case Management Statement

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department E, Patrick T. Meyers, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Trial Setting Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • at 09:00 AM in Department R, Brian F. Gasdia, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department F, Margaret Miller Bernal, Presiding; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
81 More Docket Entries
  • 09/05/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Katherine Sanceri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Katherine Sanceri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Complaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by Katherine Sanceri (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Order-Court Fee Waiver (AS TO KATHERINE SANCERI ); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • Request-Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff, & Plaintiff in Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: VC066546    Hearing Date: December 02, 2019    Dept: SEF

SANCERI v. ANDERSON

CASE NO.: VC066546

HEARING: 12/2/19 in Department SE F-Master Calendar

Calendar #2

TENTATIVE ORDER

Defendant Anderson’s motion to continue trial is GRANTED.

Moving Party to give NOTICE.

Defendant Anderson moves to continue trial.

A motion to continue trial is a disfavored motion. “To ensure the prompt disposition of civil cases, the dates assigned for a trial are firm. All parties and their counsel must regard the date set for trial as certain.” (CRC 3.1332(a).)

“The court must look beyond the limited facts which cause a litigant to request a last-minute continuance and consider the degree of diligence in his or her efforts to bring the case to trial, including participating in earlier court hearings, conducting discovery, and preparing for trial.” (Oliveros v. County of Los Angeles (2004) 120 Cal.App.4th 1389, 1395, citing to Link v. Cater (1998) 60 Cal.App.4th 1315, 1324-1325.)

Good cause exists to continue trial in this instance because Defendant was unable to reserve an MSJ hearing prior to the current trial date of 2/19/20. The MSJ is currently set for hearing on 3/12/20.

Accordingly, the motion is GRANTED. The current trial date will be reset.