This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2019 at 00:29:11 (UTC).

KATHERINE PARNELLO VS WILLIAM J GLUCKSMAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/11/2017 KATHERINE PARNELLO filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WILLIAM J GLUCKSMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ELAINE LU and PATRICIA D. NIETO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9216

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ELAINE LU

PATRICIA D. NIETO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PARNELLO KATHERINE

Defendants and Respondents

KOLODY LAW GROUP

GLUCKSMAN WILLIAM J.

KOLODNY & ANTEAU

DOES 1 TO 50

KOLODNY STEPHEN A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

KURTZ GARY ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

ROBIE & MATTHAI

MATTHAI EDITH R

 

Court Documents

DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/23/2018: DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF FOR: 1. FRAUD; ETC

10/11/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF FOR: 1. FRAUD; ETC

Stipulation and Order

7/24/2019: Stipulation and Order

Minute Order

7/10/2019: Minute Order

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

8/30/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

Minute Order

8/30/2018: Minute Order

Summons on Cross Complaint

4/23/2018: Summons on Cross Complaint

Minute Order

5/25/2018: Minute Order

KATHERINE PARNELLO'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

5/29/2018: KATHERINE PARNELLO'S ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF RULING RE MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT

6/4/2018: NOTICE OF RULING RE MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT

NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

6/21/2018: NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT

7/2/2018: NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

8/2/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

8/16/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

8/20/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF FOR: 1. FRAUD; 2. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; 3. CONVERSION; 4. DECLARATORY RELIEF; AND 5. INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS.

1/18/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF FOR: 1. FRAUD; 2. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; 3. CONVERSION; 4. DECLARATORY RELIEF; AND 5. INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS.

SUMMONS

1/18/2018: SUMMONS

SUMMONS

10/11/2017: SUMMONS

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 24; Order to Show Cause Re: (Sanctions for Plaintiff's Failure to File Settlement Report) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 24; Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE: RETENTION OF COURT'S JURISDICTION UNDER CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 664.6 FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ENTIRE ACTION); Filed by Stephen A. Kolodny (Defendant); Kolody Law Group (Defendant); Kolodny & Anteau (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • at 08:33 AM in Department 24; (REPORT) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Legacy Event Type : REPORT)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Stephen A. Kolodny (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 24; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-08-30 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2018
  • DEFENDANTS KOLODNY & ANTEAU AND KOLODNY LAW GROUP CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR (1) BREACH OF CONTRACT; ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • Summons on Cross Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Katherine Parnello (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Katherine Parnello (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF FOR: 1. FRAUD; 2. BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY; 3. CONVERSION; 4. DECLARATORY RELIEF; AND 5. INTENTIONAL INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Katherine Parnello (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND EQUITABLE RELIEF FOR: 1. FRAUD; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KOLODNY & ANTEAU is a litigant

Latest cases where KOLODNY LAW GROUP A PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant