This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2022 at 03:36:35 (UTC).

KATHERINE JIN VS TIFFANY DIAMOND

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 KATHERINE JIN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TIFFANY DIAMOND. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LIA MARTIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4704

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LIA MARTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JIN KATHERINE

Defendant

DIAMOND TIFFANY AKA TIFFANY NHUNG DIAMOND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEROPIAN EDISSON

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/7/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

2/7/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/7/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/7/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/7/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/7/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/7/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/23/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/23/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

6/27/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/24/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

6/24/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILUR...)

6/29/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILUR...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILUR...) OF 06/29/2022

6/29/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILUR...) OF 06/29/2022

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2022
  • Hearing10/13/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions against plaintiff for failure to appear this date

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • Hearing10/13/2022 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16, Lia Martin, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 16; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILUR...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF FOR FAILUR...) of 06/29/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment (/ Default Rejected); Filed by Katherine Jin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Katherine Jin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Katherine Jin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Katherine Jin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Katherine Jin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seropian, Eddison