This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2023 at 17:32:34 (UTC).

KATERINE PUAC CASASOLA VS PARTNERS PERSONNEL-MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC , A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 KATERINE PUAC CASASOLA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against PARTNERS PERSONNEL-MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC , A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4491

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TIMOTHY PATRICK DILLON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASASOLA KATERINE PUAC

Defendants

PARTNERS PERSONNEL - MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

WE PACK IT ALL LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YOUNESSI RAMIN R.

Defendant Attorney

CATO CHRISTOPHER B.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

6/14/2023: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (RES ID: 9139); WE...)

6/8/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (RES ID: 9139); WE...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (RES ID: 9139); WE...) OF 06/08/2023

6/8/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION (RES ID: 9139); WE...) OF 06/08/2023

Status Conference Statement - STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT JOINT POST RESOLVE LAW LA STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

6/6/2023: Status Conference Statement - STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT JOINT POST RESOLVE LAW LA STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFFS INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS

6/1/2023: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFFS INDIVIDUAL CLAIMS

Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO PURPORTED EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT PARTNERS PERSONNEL-MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT HER CLAIMS TO BINDING ARBI

5/25/2023: Objection - OBJECTION PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO PURPORTED EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT PARTNERS PERSONNEL-MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT HER CLAIMS TO BINDING ARBI

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/25/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PARTNERS PERSONNEL-MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT HER CLAIMS TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAYING THE LITIGAT

5/25/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PARTNERS PERSONNEL-MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT HER CLAIMS TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAYING THE LITIGAT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF KATERINE PUAC CASASOLA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

5/25/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF KATERINE PUAC CASASOLA IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Opposition - OPPOSITION [AMENDED] PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PARTNERS PERSONNEL-MANAGEMENT SERVICES,LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT HER CLAIMS TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAYING TH

5/25/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION [AMENDED] PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT PARTNERS PERSONNEL-MANAGEMENT SERVICES,LLCS MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT HER CLAIMS TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAYING TH

Case Management Statement

5/24/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/24/2023: Case Management Statement

Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION DEFENDANT WEPACKITALL'S NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER IN DEFENDANT PARTNERS PERSONNEL'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, PROOF OF SERVICE

5/22/2023: Joinder to Motion - JOINDER TO MOTION DEFENDANT WEPACKITALL'S NOTICE OF JOINDER AND JOINDER IN DEFENDANT PARTNERS PERSONNEL'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, PROOF OF SERVICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

3/9/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

3/9/2023: Case Management Statement

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/24/2023: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Motion to Compel Arbitration

2/24/2023: Motion to Compel Arbitration

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2023
  • Hearing12/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 73 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Arbitration Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2023
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Partners Personnel - Management Services, LLC , a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Compel Arbitration (Res ID: (9139): Filed By: Partners Personnel - Management Services, LLC , a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 06/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Joinder to Motion Defendant WePackItAll's Notice of Joinder and Joinder in Defendant Partners Personnel's Motion to Compel Arbitration, Proof of Service: Filed By: We Pack It All, LLC , a California limited liability company (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 06/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketPost-Arbitration Status Conference scheduled for 12/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 73

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration (Res ID: 9139); We...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration (Res ID: 9139); We...) of 06/08/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Stay - Binding Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration (Res ID: 9139); and Wepackitall, LLC's Joinder in Defendant Partners Personnel-Management Services, LLC's Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 06/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 73 updated: Result Date to 06/08/2023; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketPost-Settlement Status Conference Re: Resolve Law LA scheduled for 06/08/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 73 updated: Result Date to 06/08/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketAddress for Ramin R. Younessi (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 73

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: KATERINE PUAC CASASOLA (Plaintiff); As to: PARTNERS PERSONNEL-MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC , a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); WE PACK IT ALL, LLC , a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: KATERINE PUAC CASASOLA (Plaintiff); As to: PARTNERS PERSONNEL-MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC , a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); WE PACK IT ALL, LLC , a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: KATERINE PUAC CASASOLA (Plaintiff); As to: PARTNERS PERSONNEL-MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LLC , a Delaware limited liability company (Defendant); WE PACK IT ALL, LLC , a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less