This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/09/2021 at 12:00:56 (UTC).

KATERINA NICOLE CAPTANIS VS SANDRA VALESKA RAMOS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 KATERINA NICOLE CAPTANIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SANDRA VALESKA RAMOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1668

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPTANIS KATERINA NICOLE

Defendants

RAMOS JOSE LUIS

RAMOS SANDRA VALESKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BECK MITCHELL

Defendant Attorneys

BORROMEO IRENE GAVIOLA

DEMAIO MICHELLE MARIE BROWN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2023
  • Hearing08/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • Hearing02/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • Hearing02/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Sandra Valeska Ramos (Defendant); Jose Luis Ramos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM); Filed by Sandra Valeska Ramos (Defendant); Jose Luis Ramos (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Katerina Nicole Captanis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Katerina Nicole Captanis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Katerina Nicole Captanis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Katerina Nicole Captanis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Katerina Nicole Captanis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BORROMEO IRENE G.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DEMAIO MICHELLE MARIE BROWN