This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/06/2017 at 11:26:10 (UTC).

KATE S CHOI VS BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 KATE S CHOI filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0432

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CHOI KATE S.

Defendants and Respondents

WOLFENDEN ROBERT

BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

DOES 1 THROUGH 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

EOM JOHN ESQ.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/9/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

COMPLAINT TO: SET ASIDE TRUSTEE'S SALE AND FOR DAMAGES 1. SET ASIDE TRUSTEE SALE; ETC

5/5/2017: COMPLAINT TO: SET ASIDE TRUSTEE'S SALE AND FOR DAMAGES 1. SET ASIDE TRUSTEE SALE; ETC

SUMMONS

5/5/2017: SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2017
  • Request for Dismissal (W/OUT PREJUDICE/ COMPLAINT/ ENTIRE ACTION ) Filed by Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • Notice-Case Management Conference Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less