This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/19/2022 at 07:51:17 (UTC).

KATE AYALA VS CITY OF COMPTON

Case Summary

On 09/18/2017 KATE AYALA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF COMPTON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE, EDWARD B. MORETON and WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6387

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

WILLIAM A. CROWFOOT

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

AYALA KATE

AYALA ALMA

Respondents and Defendants

COMPTON CITY OF

DOES 1 TO 100

CITY OF COMPTON

Guardian Ad Litem and Plaintiff

AYALA ALMA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

BOOKER ROBERT L.

BOOKER ROBERT L. II ESQ.

SARANI SHABNAM L.

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

CORNWELL CRAIG J. DEPUTY CITY ATTY

PAZ JOSE RAMON DEPUTY CITY ATTORNEY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT OF MONEY INTO BLOCKE...)

1/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT OF MONEY INTO BLOCKE...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT OF MONEY INTO BLOCKE...)

1/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT OF MONEY INTO BLOCKE...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

1/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT OF MONIES INTO BLOCK...)

9/28/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT OF MONIES INTO BLOCK...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT OF MONIES INTO BLOCK...) OF 09/28/2021

9/28/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT OF MONIES INTO BLOCK...) OF 09/28/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED A...)

11/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED A...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT; DISMISSAL) OF 07/26/2021

7/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT; DISMISSAL) OF 07/26/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT; DISMISSAL)

7/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT; DISMISSAL)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE WITH SPECIA...)

4/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE WITH SPECIA...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RESCHEDULED HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MI...)

3/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: RESCHEDULED HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MI...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RESCHEDULED HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MI...) OF 03/15/2021

3/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: RESCHEDULED HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MI...) OF 03/15/2021

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

3/22/2021: Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN ORDER C...)

1/6/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN ORDER C...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); ORDER TO SHOW...)

11/25/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); ORDER TO SHOW...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); ORDER TO SHOW...) OF 11/25/2020

11/25/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); ORDER TO SHOW...) OF 11/25/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE WITH SPECIA...)

12/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR'S COMPROMISE WITH SPECIA...)

Notice - NOTICE ATTACHMENT NO. 13B(4) TO PETITION TO APPROVE MINORS COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

10/9/2020: Notice - NOTICE ATTACHMENT NO. 13B(4) TO PETITION TO APPROVE MINORS COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

Notice - NOTICE ATTACHMENT NO. 18(A) TO PETITION TO APPROVE MINORS COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

10/9/2020: Notice - NOTICE ATTACHMENT NO. 18(A) TO PETITION TO APPROVE MINORS COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2022
  • Hearing05/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account as to Minor Claimant: Kate Ayala (Age 13 ; Request for Dismissal of the Entire Action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • Docketat 11:56 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account as to Minor Claimant Kate Ayala (Age 13 ; Request for Dismissal of the Entire Action) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Deposit of Money Into Blocke...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed Against Counsel for Plaintiff for Failure to Appear on 09/27/2021 and for Failure to Comply with the Court's Previous Orders - File Proof of Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account and Request for Dismissal) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account as to Minor Claimant Kate Ayala (Age 13 ; Request for Dismissal of the Entire Action) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed A...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, William A. Crowfoot, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account as to Minor Claimant Kate Ayala (Age 13 ; Request for Dismissal of the Entire Action) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Order to Show Cause Re: Proof of Deposit of Monies Into Block...) of 09/28/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketEX PARTE APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. PREMISES LIABILITY ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KATE AYALA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC676387    Hearing Date: April 26, 2021    Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA 

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

KATE AYALA,

Plaintiff,

vs.

CITY OF COMPTON,

Defendant.

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

.: BC676387

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF MINOR’S COMPROMISE

Dept. 27

8:30 a.m.

April 26, 2021

Claimant Kate Ayala (“Claimant”), a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Alma Ayala (“Petitioner”), has agreed to settle her claims against Defendant City of Compton in exchange for $75,000. $4,718.46 will be used for medical expenses, $18,750 will be used for attorney’s fees, and $8,016.97 will be used for non-medical expenses, leaving a balance of $43,514.57 for Claimant to be deposited into a blocked account, subject to withdrawal only upon authorization of the court.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim.  (Probate Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code Civ. Proc. § 372.)  The Court has reviewed the proposed settlement and finds that it is fair and reasonable.  Further, the requested attorney’s fees, which amount to approximately 25% of the total settlement, is fair and reasonable.

The unopposed Petition to approve minor’s compromise is GRANTED.

The Court sets an OSC for July 26, 2021 for proof of deposit. an acknowledgement of receipt by the financial institution is filed before that date, no appearance will be required.

Per California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952, Petitioner and Claimant must appear at the hearing, unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance.  The Court finds that Claimant and Petitioner do not need to appear. 

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  

Dated this 26th day of April 2021

Hon. Edward B. Moreton, Jr. 

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC676387    Hearing Date: January 06, 2021    Dept: 27

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA 

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

KATE AYALA,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

CITY OF COMPTON,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

) ) ) ) )

BC676387

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING PAYMENT BY DEFENDANT CITY OF COMPTON PURSUANT TO THE TERMS OF THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BERTWEEN THE PARTIES AND MINORS COMPROMISE ORDER OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO ENTER JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT CITY OF COMPTON

Dept. 27

1:30 p.m.

January 6, 2021

On September 4, 2020, Plaintiff Kate Ayala, a minor by and through her guardian ad litem, Alma Ayala, filed this Motion for an order compelling Defendant City of Compton to pay $75,000 pursuant to a settlement agreement executed on August 2, 2019.  Plaintiff refers to an order approving a minor’s compromise application on November 7, 2019 as the authority for granting this Motion.  However, a minute order dated November 7, 2019 denied Petitioner’s expedited petition filed on October 24, 2019 and it appears the order to deposit money into blocked account and order approving minor’s compromise were inadvertently signed.  

The Court notes a similar Motion was brought, called for hearing, and denied on August 13, 2020.  A petition for order approving minor’s compromise was then filed on October 9, 2020 and heard and denied on December 3, 2020. As such, there is no existing settlement that has been approved by the Court that can be enforced.  The Motion is DENIED. 

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT27@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  

6th day of January 2021

Hon. Edward B. Moreton, Jr.

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC676387    Hearing Date: November 07, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PETITION TO CONFIRM MINOR’S COMPROMISE

Claimant Kate Ayala (“Claimant”), a minor, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Alma Ayala (“Petitioner”), has agreed to settle her claims against Defendant City of Compton in exchange for $75,000. If approved, $4,218.46 will be used for medical expenses, $18,750 will be used for attorney’s fees, and $7,754.27 will be used for non-medical expenses, leaving a balance of $44,227.27 for Claimant.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (Probate Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code Civ. Proc. § 372.) The requested attorney’s fees, which amounts to approximately 25% of the total settlement, is fair and reasonable. However, the Court has reviewed the proposed settlement and finds that it is deficient. Item 19 of the Petition does not indicate how the settlement proceeds will be disbursed. The fact that the Petitioner submitted an order regarding a blocked account suggests she intends the proceeds to be put into a blocked account. If that is the case, Item 19b(2) should be checked and Attachment 19b(2) submitted.

Also, there is no evidence of the $4,218.46 in outstanding medical expenses that will need to be reimbursed from the proceeds, only evidence of a reduction in fees by Medi-Cal. Therefore it is uncertain how much of the settlement proceeds will be distributed to Claimant.

The proposed order (form MC-351) does not state in Item 7 how the proceeds will be paid out. If Petitioner intends the amount to be paid into a blocked account, Item 7c(2)(a) should be checked with the amount filled in.

The unopposed Petition to approve minor’s compromise is DENIED without prejudice.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMPTON CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF COMPTON is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CORNWELL CRAIG J. DEPUTY CITY ATTY