This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/01/2023 at 07:41:37 (UTC).

KASSABIAN DEVELOPMENTS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS GARABET KASSABIAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/13/2022 KASSABIAN DEVELOPMENTS INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GARABET KASSABIAN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOLLY J. FUJIE and MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1476

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOLLY J. FUJIE

MITCHELL L. BECKLOFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KASSABIAN DEVELOPMENTS INC. DBA KASSABIAN DESIGN BUILD

Cross Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

KASSABIAN GALIA

KASSABIAN GARABET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GIVEN BERNARD R.

Defendant Attorney

PAPAZIAN ARMEN F.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

LEGITTINO TRICIA L

 

Court Documents

Notice of Related Case

12/14/2022: Notice of Related Case

Order - ORDER DENYING APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

7/15/2022: Order - ORDER DENYING APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (CCP 484.040))

7/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF ATTACHMENT (CCP 484.040))

Declaration - DECLARATION OF GALIA KASSABIAN ISO OPPOSITION TO PLF'S APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER

7/8/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF GALIA KASSABIAN ISO OPPOSITION TO PLF'S APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER

7/8/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAMES A. DOOLEY ISO OPPOSITION TO PLF'S APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER

7/8/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JAMES A. DOOLEY ISO OPPOSITION TO PLF'S APPLICATION FOR RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER

Case Management Statement

6/20/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/21/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/22/2022

6/22/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 06/22/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

6/22/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

6/10/2022: Answer - ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

6/2/2022: Case Management Statement

Cross-Complaint

5/9/2022: Cross-Complaint

Answer

5/9/2022: Answer

Answer

5/9/2022: Answer

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

2/8/2022: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Personal Service

3/2/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)

3/28/2022: Notice of Application and Hearing for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2023
  • Hearing09/11/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2023
  • Hearing08/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Related Case: Filed By: Galia Kassabian (Cross-Complainant); Result: Reviewed - No Action Required ; Result Date: 12/15/2022 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: Galia Kassabian (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Tricia L Legittino (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz P.C. to Frankfurt Kurnit Klein & Selz P.C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketOrder Denying Application for Writ of Attachment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketHearing on Application for Writ of Attachment (CCP 484.040) scheduled for 07/15/2022 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 86 updated: Result Date to 07/15/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketOpposition to Plaintiff's Application for Right to Attach Order; Filed by: Galia Kassabian (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Galia Kassabian ISO Opposition to Plf's Application for Right to Attach Order; Filed by: Galia Kassabian (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketAddress for Bernard R. Given (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Kassabian Developments Inc. (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from Kassabian Developments Inc., a California corporation to Kassabian Developments Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 56

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kassabian Developments Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Garabet Kassabian (Defendant); Galia Kassabian (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kassabian Developments Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Garabet Kassabian (Defendant); Galia Kassabian (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kassabian Developments Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Garabet Kassabian (Defendant); Galia Kassabian (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KASSABIAN DEVELOPMENTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PAPAZIAN ARMEN