This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 09:46:24 (UTC).

KARON JOHNSON ET AL VS ALBERT GOMEZ LOPEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/13/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by KARON JOHNSON against ALBERT GOMEZ LOPEZ in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4413

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Plaintiffs

JOHNSON DARREL DEON

JOHNSON KARON

Respondents and Defendants

LOPEZ ALBERT GOMEZ

PRIMO EXPRESS TRANSPORT INC

DOES 1 TO 25

 

Court Documents

Answer

4/20/2018: Answer

ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

6/15/2018: ANSWER-PERSONAL INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

6/15/2018: DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

9/11/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

Notice of Change of Firm Name

10/19/2018: Notice of Change of Firm Name

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

6/14/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person

Cross-Complaint

4/23/2018: Cross-Complaint

Other -

4/23/2018: Other -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

3/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

4/11/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

SUMMONS

2/13/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

2/13/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Hearingat 10:00 AM in Department 2 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Primo Express Transport Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by Primo Express Transport Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketPartial Dismissal (w/o Prejudice); Filed by Primo Express Transport Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Albert Gomez Lopez (Defendant); Primo Express Transport Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Albert Gomez Lopez (Defendant); Primo Express Transport Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketAnswer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Karon Johnson (Legacy Party); Darrel Deon Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Karon Johnson (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Karon Johnson (Legacy Party); Darrel Deon Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Darrel Deon Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC694413    Hearing Date: November 22, 2019    Dept: 2

Johnson v. Gomez Lopez, et al.

The unopposed Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel for Plaintiff, Karon Johnson is GRANTED. Counsel has complied with the requirements of Cal Rules of Court 3.1362. PLEASE NOTE THAT THIS ORDER WILL NOT BE EFFECTIVE UNTIL PROOF OF SERVICE OF THE ORDER ON KARON JOHNSON IS FILED WITH THE COURT. COUNSEL WILL REMAIN COUNSEL OF RECORD UNTIL THAT PROOF OF SERVICE IS FILED.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.