This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/15/2020 at 00:41:59 (UTC).

KARLA YULISSA HERNANDEZ ET AL VS ABEL FUERTE DUENAS

Case Summary

On 04/27/2018 KARLA YULISSA HERNANDEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ABEL FUERTE DUENAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4172

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RANDOLPH M. HAMMOCK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

RUIZ JOSUE

HERNANDEZ KARLA YULISSA

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 100

DUENAS ABEL FUERTE

Los Angeles, CA 90018

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

NAVA ALFREDO ESQ.

NAVA ALFREDO JR

NAVA ALFREDO

Defendant Attorneys

CERON DANNY

WILSON JASON SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

12/19/2019: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

12/19/2019: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

11/21/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Substitution of Attorney

6/3/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Demand for Jury Trial

6/3/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

5/3/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/3/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/1/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Reply - Reply Reply Declaration

2/20/2019: Reply - Reply Reply Declaration

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5))

2/28/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default (CCP 473.5))

Motion for Order - Motion for Order for Relief

12/11/2018: Motion for Order - Motion for Order for Relief

Answer

12/11/2018: Answer

Declaration - Declaration of Jose Ruiz in Support of Request for Default Judgment

10/5/2018: Declaration - Declaration of Jose Ruiz in Support of Request for Default Judgment

Order - Order Ruling Re: Request for Default Judgment by Plaintiffs Karla Yulissa Hernandez Josue Ruiz Against Defendant5 Abel Fuerte Duenas

10/5/2018: Order - Order Ruling Re: Request for Default Judgment by Plaintiffs Karla Yulissa Hernandez Josue Ruiz Against Defendant5 Abel Fuerte Duenas

Request - Request for Attorney Fees in Support of Default Judgment; Declaration of Alfredo Nava

10/5/2018: Request - Request for Attorney Fees in Support of Default Judgment; Declaration of Alfredo Nava

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/11/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Non-Appearance Case Review (Plaintiff's Report re Settlement) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Karla Yulissa Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Karla Yulissa Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Karla Yulissa Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (TO CORRECT NAME ON ORDER) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketOrder (PROPOSED); Filed by Karla Yulissa Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketOrder (Approving Compromise of Pending Action); Filed by Karla Yulissa Hernandez (Plaintiff); Josue Ruiz (Plaintiff); Jancy Hernandez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketOrder (to Deposit Money into Blocked Account); Filed by Karla Yulissa Hernandez (Plaintiff); Josue Ruiz (Plaintiff); Jancy Hernandez (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application TO CORRECT NAME ON ORDER)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application (TO CORRECT NAME ON ORDER); Filed by Karla Yulissa Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
74 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 24; Unknown Event Type

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT AND OF ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Karla Yulissa Hernandez (Plaintiff); Josue Ruiz (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC704172    Hearing Date: December 19, 2019    Dept: 24

Plaintiffs Karla Yulissa Hernandez and Josue Ruiz brought the instant habitability suit against Defendant Abel Fuerta Duenas. The Complaint states eight causes of action related to uninhabitable conditions at the converted garage apartment rented to Plaintiffs. The minor Plaintiffs/Claimants Xiomara Hernandez and Jancy Herndandez were added in as plaintiffs pursuant to a stipulation after mediation/settlement. Karla is the petitioner and guardian ad litem for the minor plaintiffs.

The parties having appeared (CRC Rule 7.952(a)), and the Court having reviewed and heard the Petitions, the Court finds that the settlement is reasonable, and based thereon, approves and GRANTS the petitions. (CRC Rule 7.950.) The Court intends to sign the proposed Orders (MC-351, MC-355).

THE COURT SETS AN OSC RE COMPLIANCE/PROOF OF RECEIPT OF DEPOSIT ON March 27, 2020 AT 8:30 AM. No appearance required if receipt filed.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.