Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2019 at 03:31:06 (UTC).

KARLA MARILYN GUERRA ET AL VS RH MORTUARY CORPORATION ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/18/2017 KARLA MARILYN GUERRA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RH MORTUARY CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7412

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

GUERRA KARLA MARILYN

UERRA ANDREA "CHACHI'

OROZCO PETER ANDREW

GUERRA RAMIRO ALEJANDRO

GUERRA DAVID ALEXANDER

GONZALEZ SOPHIA GABRIELA

GUERRA DALIAN LETICIA

GUERRA MEZA DE FLORES BRENDA EVELYN

LEIVA ANDRES

LEIVA LUCRECIA

GUERRA CERVANTES ANDREA LIZZETTE

GONZALEZ ROBERT MICHAEL

GONZALEZ ALVARO ENRIQUE

MEZA JULIA LEONOR

Defendants and Respondents

RH CEMETRY CORP

ROSE HILLS MEMORRIAL PARK

DOES 1 TO 50

RH MORTUARY CORPORATION

RH CEMETERY CORP. DBA ROSE HILLS MEMORIAL PARK

RH MORTUARY CORPORATION DBA ROSE HILLS MORTUARY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

ANTHONY GREGORY JON

Defendant Attorney

SHIRLEY CANDACE H

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL EX PARTE

1/30/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL EX PARTE

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

1/30/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

4/16/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

Complaint

11/1/2018: Complaint

Unknown

1/28/2019: Unknown

Summons

1/28/2019: Summons

Unknown

2/14/2019: Unknown

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian

2/14/2019: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian

Unknown

2/26/2019: Unknown

Unknown

2/26/2019: Unknown

Summons

2/28/2019: Summons

Minute Order

2/28/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

2/28/2019: Unknown

Unknown

3/28/2019: Unknown

Unknown

3/28/2019: Unknown

Answer

5/3/2019: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/22/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND OTHER RELIEF BASED UPON NEGLIGENCE

12/18/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND OTHER RELIEF BASED UPON NEGLIGENCE

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by DAVID ALEXANDER GUERRA (Plaintiff); KARLA MARILYN GUERRA (Plaintiff); RAMIRO ALEJANDRO GUERRA (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by DAVID ALEXANDER GUERRA (Plaintiff); KARLA MARILYN GUERRA (Plaintiff); RAMIRO ALEJANDRO GUERRA (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • Answer; Filed by RH CEMETERY CORP. (Defendant); RH MORTUARY CORPORATION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Amy Elizabeth Westwood (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Proof of Service - No Service; Filed by DAVID ALEXANDER GUERRA (Plaintiff); KARLA MARILYN GUERRA (Plaintiff); RAMIRO ALEJANDRO GUERRA (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Proof of Service - No Service; Filed by DAVID ALEXANDER GUERRA (Plaintiff); KARLA MARILYN GUERRA (Plaintiff); RAMIRO ALEJANDRO GUERRA (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for order authorizing filing of second amended complaint and issuance of second amended summons correctly identifying plaintiff Sophia Gabriela Gonzalez) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Summons (on Amended Complaint (1st)); Filed by Gregory Jon Anthony (Attorney); DAVID ALEXANDER GUERRA (Plaintiff); KARLA MARILYN GUERRA (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Complaint ( (2nd)); Filed by DAVID ALEXANDER GUERRA (Plaintiff); KARLA MARILYN GUERRA (Plaintiff); RAMIRO ALEJANDRO GUERRA (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Summons (on Amended Complaint (2nd)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND OTHER RELIEF BASED UPON NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by KARLA MARILYN GUERRA (Plaintiff); ANDREA "CHACHI' UERRA (Plaintiff); PETER ANDREW OROZCO (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC687412    Hearing Date: February 17, 2021    Dept: 28

Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Action

Having considered petitioning papers, the Court rules as follows. pposing papers have been filed.

BACKGROUND

On December 18, 2017, a number of plaintiffs, including Plaintiff Abigail Esther Guerra, filed a complaint against Defendants RH Mortuary Corporation and RH Cemetery Corp.  The plaintiffs allege negligence arising from the deficient burial of Ramiro Antonio Guerra on March 11, 2017, which caused him to get stuck and lodge at or near the apex of a in the direct line of sight of the plaintiffs.

On September 11, 2020, Petitioner Dalian Leticia Guerra filed a petition to approve a compromise of pending action for Claimant Abigail Esther Guerra.

An Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) is scheduled for March 17, 2021.

PARTYS REQUEST

Petitioner Dalian Leticia Guerra (“Petitioner”) asks the Court to approve a compromise of pending action for Abigail Esther Guerra (“Claimant”).

LEGAL STANDARD

Pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952, subdivision (a), Petitioner and Claimant are required to attend the hearing on the petition.  However, the Court finds that Petitioner’s and Claimant’s attendance are not required due to Claimant’s age and the settlement amount.

DISCUSSION

The Court finds the amended petition is properly approved.  All required information and attachments have been filed.  The $1,000.00 gross settlement is reasonable considering Claimant’s injuries are minor.  The requested costs totaling $500.00 have been reduced from $822.11 and are adequately explainedAs such, the petition is approved.

CONCLUSION

The petition filed on September 11, 2020 is APPROVED.

There is an OSC re settlement on March 17, 2021. 

Petitioner is ordered to give notice of this ruling.

Petitioner is ordered to file the proof of service of this ruling with the Court within five days.

The parties are directed to the header of this tentative ruling for further instructions.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where . Rose is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHIRLEY CANDACE H