This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/07/2022 at 16:59:28 (UTC).

KARLA HERNANDEZ VS JEFFREY CARL DE SALVO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 KARLA HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JEFFREY CARL DE SALVO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0700

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HERNANDEZ KARLA

Defendants

DE SALVO JEFFREY CARL

RATLIFF JENIFER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

WOOLSEY MIGOYA KELLY

CHAVEZ NORMA PEDROZA

Other Attorneys

GRIGORYAN IVY

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/18/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

4/5/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

4/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Proof of Personal Service

4/6/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

5/6/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/22/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Association of Attorney

12/7/2021: Association of Attorney

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2024
  • Hearing03/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • Hearing09/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • Hearing09/01/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Jeffrey Carl De Salvo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jeffrey Carl De Salvo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Karla Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Karla Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Karla Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Karla Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Karla Hernandez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRIGORYAN IVY B.