This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/04/2022 at 19:44:27 (UTC).

KARLA GOMEZ VS DARREN CHRISTOPHER BROWN

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 KARLA GOMEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DARREN CHRISTOPHER BROWN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8831

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GOMEZ KARLA

Defendant

BROWN DARREN CHRISTOPHER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOPEZ VENTURA IVAN M. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

ARABI ARASH

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/20/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/20/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

11/5/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/5/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Answer

3/18/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2024
  • Hearing10/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2023
  • Hearing04/19/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2023
  • Hearing04/05/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by DARREN CHRISTOPHER BROWN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by KARLA GOMEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by KARLA GOMEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KARLA GOMEZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOPEZ VENTURA IVAN M.