This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2023 at 21:40:06 (UTC).

KARLA GARCIA VS BUBBA GUMP SHRIMP CO ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/12/2017 KARLA GARCIA filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against BUBBA GUMP SHRIMP CO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SERENA R. MURILLO and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6568

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SERENA R. MURILLO

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SERVIN YUNUEN

Defendant

BUBBA GUMP SHRIMP CO RESTAURANTS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MGDESYAN GEORGE GEVORK ESQ.

BELORYAN HAIK ARMEN ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

WILLIAMSON JOHN SCHENCK III ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

3/17/2021: Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

Request for Dismissal

3/17/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: - COMPLIANCE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT OF MON...)

3/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: - COMPLIANCE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT OF MON...)

Notice of Ruling

1/26/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: - COMPLIANCE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT OF MON...)

1/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: - COMPLIANCE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT OF MON...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: - COMPLIANCE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT OF MON...)

11/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: - COMPLIANCE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT OF MON...)

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account - ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT (AS TO MINOR CLAIMANT: KARLA GARCIA)

9/29/2020: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account - ORDER TO DEPOSIT MONEY INTO BLOCKED ACCOUNT (AS TO MINOR CLAIMANT: KARLA GARCIA)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF ...) OF 09/29/2020

9/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF ...) OF 09/29/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF ...)

9/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF ...)

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

9/29/2020: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Declaration - DECLARATION OF HAIK BELORYAN, ESQ. RE MINOR'S COMPROMISE

9/28/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF HAIK BELORYAN, ESQ. RE MINOR'S COMPROMISE

Minute Order - (AMENDED)

9/28/2020: Minute Order - (AMENDED)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF...) OF 07/28/2020

7/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF...) OF 07/28/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF...)

7/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/16/2020

4/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/16/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL...)

2/19/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS AGAINST PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF HAIK BELORYAN IN SUPPORT OF OSC RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT A HEARING

2/13/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF HAIK BELORYAN IN SUPPORT OF OSC RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR AT A HEARING

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketERROR with ROA message definition 92 on [ln 37, col 39] with Document:81207266

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by KARLA GARCIA on 01/12/2017, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Karla Garcia and Yunuen Servin as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Unconditional Notice Filed 11/27/2018 scheduled for 01/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/19/2020 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Unconditional Notice Filed 11/27/2018 scheduled for 06/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: - Compliance: Proof of Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account scheduled for 06/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by: Karla Garcia (Plaintiff); As to: Yunuen Servin (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Unconditional Notice Filed 11/27/2018 scheduled for 06/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: - Compliance: Proof of Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account scheduled for 06/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: - Compliance: Proof of Deposit of Mon...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: - Compliance: Proof of Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account scheduled for 03/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 06/30/2021 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2017
  • DocketDocument:Notice, Association of Counsel Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • DocketDocument:Summons Filed Filed by: Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • DocketDocument:Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • DocketDocument:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • DocketCalendaring:OSC RE Dismissal 01/13/20 at 8:30 am Patricia D. Nieto

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Yunuen Servin (Legacy Party); Karla Garcia (Legacy Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Filed By: Yunuen Servin (Legacy Party),Karla Garcia (Legacy Party); Result: Granted; Result Date: 01/12/2017; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • DocketDocument:Application-Miscellaneous Filed by: Attorney for Pltf/Petnr

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • DocketDocument:Complaint Filed by: N/A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • DocketCase Filed/Opened:Premises Liablty (e.g. slip & fall)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****6568    Hearing Date: September 28, 2020    Dept: 29

Garcia  v.  Bubba Gump Shrimp

On 7/28/20, the Court ordered Plaintiff's counsel to file a supplemental declaration with a copy of counsel’s retainer agreement at least one week before the 9/28/20 hearing. The Court’s file does not reflect that counsel complied with the order.

The hearing is continued to 10/13/20 at 8:30 a.m. in Dept SS-29. Counsel is ordered to comply with the Court’s 7/28/20 order within five days.

Moving party to give notice.