This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/08/2019 at 02:11:13 (UTC).

KARL E. EPSTEIN, M.D. INC. VS 2550 DAR, L.P., ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/05/2018 KARL E EPSTEIN, M D INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 2550 DAR, L P ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6693

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KARL E. EPSTEIN M.D. INC.

Defendants

UNILEV MANAGEMENT CORP.

2550 DAR L.P.

B&T CANOGA INVESTMENT LLC

ATRIUM 6400 CAPITAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAPEER PHILIP DENNIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by KARL E. EPSTEIN, M.D. INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by KARL E. EPSTEIN, M.D. INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by KARL E. EPSTEIN, M.D. INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by KARL E. EPSTEIN, M.D. INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by KARL E. EPSTEIN, M.D. INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KARL E. EPSTEIN, M.D. INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by KARL E. EPSTEIN, M.D. INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNILEV MANAGEMENT CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAPEER PHILIP D. ESQ.