This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/03/2023 at 19:44:50 (UTC).

KARINE NALBANDIAN VS MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/05/2023 KARINE NALBANDIAN filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0040

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NALBANDIAN KARINE

Defendants

CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

MERCURY INSURANCE GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DERVISHIAN ABRAHAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2023
  • Hearing05/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department T at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: KARINE NALBANDIAN (Plaintiff); As to: MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/20/2023; Service Cost: 132.55; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: KARINE NALBANDIAN (Plaintiff); As to: MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); MERCURY INSURANCE GROUP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: KARINE NALBANDIAN (Plaintiff); As to: MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); MERCURY INSURANCE GROUP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: KARINE NALBANDIAN (Plaintiff); As to: MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); CALIFORNIA AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant); MERCURY INSURANCE GROUP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department T

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Shirley K. Watkins in Department T Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less