This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/18/2022 at 08:19:12 (UTC).

KARINA VIERO RODRIGUEZ VS KEVIN AMADEO RAMIREZ LINDAO

Case Summary

On 10/06/2022 KARINA VIERO RODRIGUEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KEVIN AMADEO RAMIREZ LINDAO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2862

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ KARINA VIERO

Defendant

RAMIREZ LINDAO KEVIN AMADEO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHELLY THOMAS H

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/6/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/6/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/6/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

10/6/2022: Unknown - NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - UNLIMITED CIVIL PERSONAL INJURY CASE

Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

10/6/2022: Unknown - SEVENTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER FOR PROCEDURES IN THE PERSONAL INJURY HUB COURTS

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

10/6/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

10/6/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/25/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2024
  • Hearing10/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2024
  • Hearing04/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2024
  • Hearing03/21/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Karina Viero Rodriguez (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 10/03/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/21/2024 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Karina Viero Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Kevin Amadeo Ramirez Lindao (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Karina Viero Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Kevin Amadeo Ramirez Lindao (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Karina Viero Rodriguez (Plaintiff); As to: Kevin Amadeo Ramirez Lindao (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketSeventh Amended Standing Order for Procedures in the Personal Injury Hub Courts; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Personal Injury Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHELLY THOMAS H.