*******5702
04/26/2021
Other
Labor - Wrongful Termination
Los Angeles, California
MICHAEL L. STERN
VANEGAS KARINA
G4S SECURE SOLUTIONS USA INC. A FLORIDA CORPORATION
KONSTANTAKOS MICHAEL
BAZERKANIAN JACK
ALLEN NICOLE DENISE
3/4/2022: Request for Dismissal
11/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL) OF 11/09/2021, JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL
11/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL)
11/9/2021: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES
10/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/26/2021, FINAL TRIAL PREPARATION
10/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
9/30/2021: Answer
9/30/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
10/12/2021: Case Management Statement
10/12/2021: Case Management Statement
10/12/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
8/25/2021: Case Management Statement
8/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESP...) OF 08/30/2021
8/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESP...)
8/30/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS G4S SECURE SOLUTIONS (USA), INC.S AND KATE BARTONS TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
4/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
4/26/2021: Complaint
4/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/09/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/07/2022
[-] Read LessDocketJury Trial scheduled for 06/13/2022 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/07/2022
[-] Read LessDocketOn the Complaint filed by Karina Vanegas on 04/26/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Karina Vanegas as to the entire action
[-] Read LessDocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Karina Vanegas (Plaintiff); As to: Karina Vanegas (Plaintiff); G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc., a Florida corporation (Defendant); Michael Konstantakos (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketJoint Stipulation and Order re Continue Trial and all Related Dates; Signed and Filed by: G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc., a Florida corporation (Defendant); Michael Konstantakos (Defendant); As to: Karina Vanegas (Plaintiff); G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc., a Florida corporation (Defendant); Michael Konstantakos (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketMinute Order (Court Order re Joint Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial)
[-] Read LessDocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Joint Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial) of 11/09/2021, Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketJury Trial scheduled for 06/13/2022 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62
[-] Read LessDocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/09/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62
[-] Read LessDocketMinute Order (Court Order)
[-] Read LessDocketAddress for Jack Bazerkanian (Attorney) updated
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/29/2021 at 11:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62
[-] Read LessDocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/10/2021 at 11:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael L. Stern in Department 62 Stanley Mosk Courthouse
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: Karina Vanegas (Plaintiff); As to: G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc., a Florida corporation (Defendant); Michael Konstantakos (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Karina Vanegas (Plaintiff); As to: G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc., a Florida corporation (Defendant); Michael Konstantakos (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Karina Vanegas (Plaintiff); As to: G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc., a Florida corporation (Defendant); Michael Konstantakos (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read Less