This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/04/2023 at 20:08:33 (UTC).

KARINA VANEGAS VS G4S SECURE SOLUTIONS (USA) INC., A FLORIDA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/26/2021 KARINA VANEGAS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against G4S SECURE SOLUTIONS USA INC , A FLORIDA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL L. STERN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5702

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL L. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VANEGAS KARINA

Defendants

G4S SECURE SOLUTIONS USA INC. A FLORIDA CORPORATION

KONSTANTAKOS MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAZERKANIAN JACK

Defendant Attorney

ALLEN NICOLE DENISE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

3/4/2022: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL) OF 11/09/2021, JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

11/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL) OF 11/09/2021, JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

11/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

11/9/2021: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE CONTINUE TRIAL AND ALL RELATED DATES

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/26/2021, FINAL TRIAL PREPARATION

10/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 10/26/2021, FINAL TRIAL PREPARATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

10/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Answer

9/30/2021: Answer

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/30/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

10/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/12/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/12/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

8/25/2021: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESP...) OF 08/30/2021

8/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESP...) OF 08/30/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESP...)

8/30/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESP...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS G4S SECURE SOLUTIONS (USA), INC.S AND KATE BARTONS TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/30/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS G4S SECURE SOLUTIONS (USA), INC.S AND KATE BARTONS TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/26/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/07/2022

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/09/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/07/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2022

DocketJury Trial scheduled for 06/13/2022 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/07/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2022

DocketOn the Complaint filed by Karina Vanegas on 04/26/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Karina Vanegas as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/04/2022

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Karina Vanegas (Plaintiff); As to: Karina Vanegas (Plaintiff); G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc., a Florida corporation (Defendant); Michael Konstantakos (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2021

DocketJoint Stipulation and Order re Continue Trial and all Related Dates; Signed and Filed by: G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc., a Florida corporation (Defendant); Michael Konstantakos (Defendant); As to: Karina Vanegas (Plaintiff); G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc., a Florida corporation (Defendant); Michael Konstantakos (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2021

DocketMinute Order (Court Order re Joint Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2021

DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order re Joint Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial) of 11/09/2021, Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2021

DocketJury Trial scheduled for 06/13/2022 at 10:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2021

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/09/2022 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2021

DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
04/27/2021

DocketAddress for Jack Bazerkanian (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2021

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/29/2021 at 11:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2021

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 09/10/2021 at 11:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 62

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2021

DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2021

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2021

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael L. Stern in Department 62 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2021

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Karina Vanegas (Plaintiff); As to: G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc., a Florida corporation (Defendant); Michael Konstantakos (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2021

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Karina Vanegas (Plaintiff); As to: G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc., a Florida corporation (Defendant); Michael Konstantakos (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2021

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Karina Vanegas (Plaintiff); As to: G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc., a Florida corporation (Defendant); Michael Konstantakos (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2021

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less