This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2021 at 20:40:07 (UTC).

KARIN TABETHA MORA, ET AL. VS AMFP IV ATRIUM, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 KARIN TABETHA MORA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against AMFP IV ATRIUM, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4546

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FLOREZ ISIDRO M.

MORA KARIN TABETHA

MORA NEHEMIAH

Defendants

AMFP IV ATRIUM LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

FPI MANAGEMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VIRAG BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

9/20/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/20/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/20/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR NEHEMIAH

9/23/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR NEHEMIAH

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2024
  • Hearing09/16/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • Hearing03/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • Hearing03/06/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem (for Nehemiah); Filed by KARIN TABETHA MORA (Plaintiff); NEHEMIAH MORA (Plaintiff); ISIDRO M. FLOREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KARIN TABETHA MORA (Plaintiff); NEHEMIAH MORA (Plaintiff); ISIDRO M. FLOREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by KARIN TABETHA MORA (Plaintiff); NEHEMIAH MORA (Plaintiff); ISIDRO M. FLOREZ (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMFP IV ATRIUM LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FPI MANAGEMENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VIRAG BRIAN