This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2021 at 02:40:53 (UTC).

KAREN WILLIAMS, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS ELIAS SHOKRIAN, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 KAREN WILLIAMS, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ELIAS SHOKRIAN, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4945

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE WILLIAMS COURT

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILLIAMS AN INDIVIDUAL KAREN

LETT AN INDIVIDUAL MONICA

Defendants

SHOKRIAN AN INDIVIDUAL ELIAS

CHARDON TERRACE LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAPMAN CHRISTOFER

Defendant Attorneys

KIM KELLY J

BAIER DENNIS MICHAEL JR

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT)

9/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT)

8/12/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOLLOWING SETTLEMENT)

Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING

7/21/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/7/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Settlement

4/8/2021: Notice of Settlement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 04/14/2021

4/14/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT) OF 04/14/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

4/14/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Related Case

3/25/2021: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

3/26/2021: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service by Mail

3/26/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

3/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 03/15/2021

3/15/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 03/15/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

2/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 02/19/2021

2/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 02/19/2021

Notice of Related Case

2/23/2021: Notice of Related Case

Case Management Order

1/28/2021: Case Management Order

Notice of Related Case

1/29/2021: Notice of Related Case

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Following Settlement) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Following Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Following Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Following Settlement)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF HEARING); Filed by Karen Williams, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Following Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (dismissal following settlement) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (sanctions, in the amount of $250, against counsel for plaintiff for failure to appear on 3/25/2021) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • Docketat 4:39 PM in Department 74, Michelle Williams Court, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Karen Williams, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Karen Williams, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Karen Williams, an individual (Plaintiff); Monica Lett, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Karen Williams, an individual (Plaintiff); Monica Lett, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Karen Williams, an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHARDON TERRACE LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAIER DENNIS M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM KELLY J