This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/18/2023 at 00:19:58 (UTC).

KAREN ROBERTS, , ET AL. VS LONG BEACH COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

Case Summary

On April 04, 2022, Karen Roberts and Seija Rohkea, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated (“Plaintiffs”), represented by Goldsmith Eileen, filed a labor lawsuit against Long Beach Community College District (“District” or “Defendant”), seeking declaratory and injunctive relief with damages, pre-judgment interest and costs, for the Defendant’s alleged unlawful pay policies and/or practices which denied Plaintiffs and Class Members the minimum wages legally owed to them for work performed during the Class Period. This case was filed in the Spring Street Courthouse in Los Angeles County Superior Court

In the complaint, the Plaintiffs have alleged that, “Part-time hourly instructional faculty members employed by the District are compensated based on their classroom hours worked, even though the District knows that these faculty members necessarily spend substantial additional time working outside the classroom in connection with teaching their assigned classes, on such activities as preparing for lectures, grading student work, and communicating with students.”

The Plaintiffs also alleged that, “Although this outside-the-classroom work is essential to teaching their classes effectively, and the District knows and indeed expects part-time faculty members to perform this additional work, part-time hourly instructional faculty members are not paid for their out-of-classroom time. As a result, part-time hourly instructional faculty members earn so little that it is virtually impossible for them to earn a living through their community college teaching.”

The Plaintiffs have further alleged that, “By failing to compensate part-time hourly instructional faculty members at all for their non-classroom working time, the District is violating California minimum wage law. This action seeks to recover unpaid minimum wages, retirement contributions owed on those wages, interest, and liquidated damages on behalf of a class of part-time instructional faculty members employed by the District.”

The Plaintiffs even further alleged that, “Plaintiffs also seek a declaratory judgment and injunctive relief to require the District to compensate part-time hourly instructional faculty members at no less than the minimum wage for each hour worked, including for the outside-the-classroom time that is required to teach their classes effectively.”

The Plaintiffs have listed two claims for relief. The first claim alleged is for the failure to pay minimum wages - Labor Code §§1194, 1194.2, 1197, 1197.1, 1199, and IWC Wage Order No. 4-2001, and the second claim alleged is for declaratory judgment - Cal. C.C.P §1060 et seq.

In their prayer for relief, the Plaintiffs have requested that the Court certify this action as a class action and award all wages due along with liquidated damages, pre-judgment interest, statutory and civil penalties, costs of suit, expenses, and reasonable attorneys’ fees. The Plaintiffs have further requested the Court for a permanent injunction requiring the District to adopt a compensation arrangement that compensates Class Members for all hours worked at no less than the minimum wage; a judicial declaration that the existing compensation structure fails to compensate part-time instructional faculty at no less than the minimum wage for all hours worked, including outside-of-classroom hours; and that the District must compensate part-time instructional faculty at no less than minimum wage for all such hours.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1381

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STUART M. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROBERTS KAREN

ROHKEA SEIJA

Defendant

LONG BEACH COMMUNITY COLLEGE DISTRICT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GOLDSMITH EILEEN BETH

SALAZAR CHRISTINE M

Defendant Attorney

QUILLER DOMINIC A

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order Regarding Continued Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs’ Motion for Class Certification

10/5/2023: Stipulation and Order (name extension) Stipulation and Order Regarding Continued Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs’ Motion for Class Certification

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

10/4/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Plaintiffs’ Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Class Certification

7/31/2023: Memorandum of Points & Authorities Plaintiffs’ Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Class Certification

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/31/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/31/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Motion for Class Certification

7/31/2023: Motion for Class Certification

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Christine M. Salazar Re Plaintiffs' Proposed Trial Plan

7/31/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Christine M. Salazar Re Plaintiffs' Proposed Trial Plan

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Laila Barada in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification

7/31/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Laila Barada in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Seija Rohkea in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification

7/31/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Seija Rohkea in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Robin Sharp in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification

7/31/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Robin Sharp in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Christine M. Salazar In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification

7/31/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Christine M. Salazar In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Breanna Campos in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification

7/31/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Breanna Campos in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Lauren Madden in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification

7/31/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Lauren Madden in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Katie Zeoli in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification

7/31/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Katie Zeoli in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Darryl Balacanao in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification

7/31/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Darryl Balacanao in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Karen Roberts in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification

7/31/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Karen Roberts in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification

Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Eileen Goldsmith in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification

7/31/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration of Eileen Goldsmith in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification

Declaration (name extension) Declaration Declaration of Kare'l Lokeni in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification

7/31/2023: Declaration (name extension) Declaration Declaration of Kare'l Lokeni in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification

35 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

12/18/2023

Hearing12/18/2023 at 10:30 AM in Department 1 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Class Certification

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2023

DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Hearing on Motion for Class Certification scheduled for 10/24/2023 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 1 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 12/18/2023 10:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023

DocketStipulation and Order Regarding Continued Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs? Motion for Class Certification; Signed and Filed by: Karen Roberts (Plaintiff); Seija Rohkea (Plaintiff); As to: Long Beach Community College District (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023

DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Regarding Continued Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs? Motion for Class Certification: Filed By: Karen Roberts (Plaintiff),Seija Rohkea (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 10/05/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/04/2023

DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Karen Roberts (Plaintiff); Seija Rohkea (Plaintiff); As to: Long Beach Community College District (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketUpdated -- Declaration of Eileen Goldsmith in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification: As To Parties:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketUpdated -- Declaration of Christine M. Salazar In Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification: As To Parties:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023

DocketUpdated -- Motion for Class Certification: Exact Name changed from Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification to Motion for Class Certification ; As To Parties:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023

DocketHearing on Motion for Class Certification scheduled for 10/04/2023 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 1

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2023

DocketUpdated -- Eileen Beth Goldsmith (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Altshuler Berzon, LLP to Altshuler Berzon et al LLP; Middle Name: Beth

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
53 More Docket Entries
View All Docket Entries
04/04/2022

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Karen Roberts, (Plaintiff); Seija Rohkea, (Plaintiff); As to: Long Beach Community College District (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel J. Buckley in Department 1 Spring Street Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Karen Roberts, (Plaintiff); Seija Rohkea, (Plaintiff); As to: Long Beach Community College District (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Karen Roberts, (Plaintiff); Seija Rohkea, (Plaintiff); As to: Long Beach Community College District (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/04/2022

DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

[+] Read More [-] Read Less