This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/26/2019 at 04:51:34 (UTC).

KAREN OLIVO VS INGEBORG MARIA AVENESSIAN

Case Summary

On 07/24/2017 KAREN OLIVO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against INGEBORG MARIA AVENESSIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and AMY D. HOGUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9676

  • Filing Date:

    07/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

AMY D. HOGUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

OLIVO KAREN

Defendants and Respondents

AVENESSIAN INGEBORG MARIA

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

THE DOMINGUEZ FIRM INC

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

ANDRADE ALVIN R. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

10/26/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT INGEBORG MARIA AVANESSIAN; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

11/20/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT INGEBORG MARIA AVANESSIAN; DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY

CIVIL DEPOSIT

12/7/2017: CIVIL DEPOSIT

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

12/7/2017: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

SUMMONS

8/9/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

7/24/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL

7/25/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL

7/25/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 7, Amy D. Hogue, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Ingeborg Maria Avenessian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Receipt; Filed by Ingeborg Maria Avenessian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • Notice; Filed by Ingeborg Maria Avenessian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Answer; Filed by Ingeborg Maria Avenessian (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Karen Olivo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Ord Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Karen Olivo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC669676    Hearing Date: October 28, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PETITIONS TO APPROVE MINOR’S COMPROMISE

Jamilson Olivo

Claimant Jamilson Olivo (“Claimant”), a minor, by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, Karen Olivo (“Petitioner”), has agreed to settle his claims against Defendant Ingeborg Maria Avanessian in exchange for $7,500.00. If approved, $765.21 will be used for medical expenses, $1,875.00 will be used for attorney’s fees, and $407.94 will be used for non-medical expenses, leaving a balance of $4,451.85 for Claimant, which will be deposited into a blocked account, subject to withdrawal only upon authorization of the court.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (Probate Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code Civ. Proc. § 372.) The Court has reviewed the proposed settlement and finds that it is fair and reasonable. Further, the requested attorney’s fees, which amounts to approximately 25% of the total settlement, is fair and reasonable.

The unopposed Petition to approve minor’s compromise is GRANTED. However, the Court does not have an electronic proposed Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account (Form MC-355) or Order Approving Compromise (Form MC-351) for Jamilson. Petitioner is to file completed forms before the hearing.

The Court sets an OSC for November 25, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 4B for proof of deposit in the blocked account. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 7.953(a).) If an acknowledgement of receipt by the financial institution is filed before that date, no appearance will be required.

Per California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952, Petitioner and Claimant must appear at the October 28, 2019 hearing, unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance. The Court finds that Claimant’s appearance is not necessary, but will require Petitioner to appear.

Jairo Olivo

Claimant Jairo Olivo (“Claimant”), a minor, by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, Karen Olivo (“Petitioner”), has agreed to settle his claims against Defendant Ingeborg Maria Avanessian in exchange for $7,000.00. If approved, $511.21 will be used for medical expenses, $1,750.00 will be used for attorney’s fees, and $409.08 will be used for non-medical expenses, leaving a balance of $4,329.71 for Claimant, which will be deposited into a blocked account, subject to withdrawal only upon authorization of the court.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (Probate Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code Civ. Proc. § 372.) The Court has reviewed the proposed settlement and finds that it is fair and reasonable. Further, the requested attorney’s fees, which amounts to approximately 25% of the total settlement, is fair and reasonable.

The unopposed Petition to approve minor’s compromise is GRANTED.

The Court sets an OSC for November 25, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 4B for proof of deposit in the blocked account. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 7.953(a).) If an acknowledgement of receipt by the financial institution is filed before that date, no appearance will be required.

Per California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952, Petitioner and Claimant must appear at the October 28, 2019 hearing, unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance. The Court finds that Claimant’s appearance is not necessary, but will require Petitioner to appear.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.