This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2021 at 11:55:34 (UTC).

KAREN LEHMANN, ET AL. VS MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 03/02/2021 KAREN LEHMANN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8138

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LEHMANN KAREN

EISNER DAVID FERRELL

Defendant

MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POCRASS JAMES LOUIS

Defendant Attorney

LOFTON LAUREN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/2/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

3/19/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

3/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Proof of Personal Service

3/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

4/5/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2024
  • Hearing02/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • Hearing08/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • Hearing08/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ashford TRS Pool A LLC dba Beverly Hills Marriott Erroneously Sued As Marriott International, Inc., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by KAREN LEHMANN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by KAREN LEHMANN (Plaintiff); DAVID FERRELL EISNER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by KAREN LEHMANN (Plaintiff); DAVID FERRELL EISNER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KAREN LEHMANN (Plaintiff); DAVID FERRELL EISNER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Marriott International Inc is a litigant