This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/06/2022 at 00:18:31 (UTC).

KAREN JOHNS VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/09/2022 KAREN JOHNS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH R. FREEMAN and DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9440

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNS KAREN

Defendants

EDISON INTERNATIONAL

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAVIPUDI RAHUL

Defendant Attorney

BEHRENS MICHAEL A.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/9/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/9/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/9/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

9/9/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/9/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/9/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES;)

9/28/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES;) OF 09/28/2022

9/28/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES;) OF 09/28/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

9/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 09/27/2022

9/27/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE COMPLEX DETERMINATION) OF 09/27/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE;)

10/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF STATUS CONFERENCE;)

Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

10/28/2022: Answer - DEFENDANTS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY AND EDISON INTERNATIONAL'S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • Hearing12/06/2022 at 3:00 PM in Department 14 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDefendants Southern California Edison Company and Edison International's Answer to Complaint; Filed by: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant); As to: Karen Johns (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 12/06/2022 at 03:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re: Notice of Continuance of Status Conference;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 10/27/2022 at 02:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 12/06/2022 03:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 10/27/2022 at 02:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCase numbers 22STCV28606, 22STCV28954, 20STCV42356, 22STCV28290, 22STCV28774, 22STCV27685, 22STCV28106, 22STCV29440, 22STCV29097 are related; case number 20STCV42356 is the lead case.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order re: Notice of Related Cases;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Notice of Related Cases;) of 09/28/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Deemed Complex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 14 - Hon. Kenneth R. Freeman; Reason: Deemed Complex (Non-Class Action)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Karen Johns (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Karen Johns (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Karen Johns (Plaintiff); As to: Southern California Edison Company (Defendant); Edison International (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • DocketCase assigned in Department 11 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EDISON INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RAVIPUDI RAHUL