This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2023 at 05:45:04 (UTC).

KAREN HARUTYUNYAN VS ANNA HAKOBYAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 KAREN HARUTYUNYAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ANNA HAKOBYAN,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6723

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARUTYUNYAN KAREN

Defendants

HAKOBYAN ANNA

HAKOBYAN DAVIT

TOFALYAN POGOS

A & H MANAGEMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MENASSIAN DRO ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

KARAPETYAN KARO GARY

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF SETTLED CASE;)

5/25/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF SETTLED CASE;)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE SETTLEMENT;) OF 03/28/2023

3/28/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE SETTLEMENT;) OF 03/28/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE SETTLEMENT;)

3/28/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE SETTLEMENT;)

Notice of Settlement

3/24/2023: Notice of Settlement

Notice of Settlement

3/24/2023: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; NON-APPEARAN...)

3/7/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; NON-APPEARAN...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE;)

3/6/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE;)

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT A&H MANAGEMENT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

2/22/2023: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT A&H MANAGEMENT'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT ANNA HAKOBYAN'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HER DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FAC

2/22/2023: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANT ANNA HAKOBYAN'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HER DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FAC

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/14/2023: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/14/2023: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/1/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

2/1/2023: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

1/27/2023: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Proof of Personal Service

1/17/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

1/13/2023: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/1/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/1/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2023
  • Hearing07/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Settled Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Settled Case scheduled for 07/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Settled Case;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Settled Case scheduled for 05/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 07/28/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Settled Case scheduled for 05/25/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re Settlement;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Settlement;) of 03/28/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 03/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 03/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 03/28/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Karen Harutyunyan (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketAddress for Dro Menassian, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Karen Harutyunyan (Plaintiff); As to: Anna Hakobyan (Defendant); Davit Hakobyan (Defendant); Pogos Tofalyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Karen Harutyunyan (Plaintiff); As to: Anna Hakobyan (Defendant); Davit Hakobyan (Defendant); Pogos Tofalyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Karen Harutyunyan (Plaintiff); As to: Anna Hakobyan (Defendant); Davit Hakobyan (Defendant); Pogos Tofalyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Barbara M. Scheper in Department 30 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******6723 Hearing Date: March 7, 2023 Dept: 30

Dept. 30

Calendar No.

Harutyunyan vs. Hakobyan, et. al., Case No. *******6723

Tentative Ruling re: Defendant’s Demurrer to First Amended Complaint

Defendant Anna Hakobyan (Hakobyan) demurs to the First Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Karen Harutyunyan (Plaintiff). The demurrer is sustained with ten (10) days leave to amend.

In reviewing the legal sufficiency of a complaint against a demurrer, a court will treat the demurrer as admitting all material facts properly pleaded, but not contentions, deductions, or conclusions of law. (Blank v. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d 311, 318 (Blank); C & H Foods Co. v. Hartford Ins. Co. (1984) 163 Cal.App.3d 1055, 1062.) It is well settled that a “demurrer lies only for defects appearing on the face of the complaint[.]” (Stevens v. Superior Court (1999) 75 Cal.App.4th 594, 601.) “The rules by which the sufficiency of a complaint is tested against a general demurrer are well settled. We not only treat the demurrer as admitting all material facts properly pleaded, but also give the complaint a reasonable interpretation, reading it as a whole and its parts in their context.” (Guclimane Co. v. Stewart Title Guaranty Co. (1998) 19 Cal.4th 26, 38 (internal quotes omitted).) For purposes of ruling on a demurrer, the complaint must be construed liberally by drawing reasonable inferences from the facts pleaded. (Wilner v. Sunset Life Ins. Co. (2000) 78 Cal.App.4th 952, 958.)

When ruling on a demurrer, the Court may only consider the complaint’s allegations or matters which may be judicially noticed. (Blank, supra, 39 Cal.3d at p. 318.) The Court may not consider any other extrinsic evidence or judge the credibility of the allegations plead or the difficulty a plaintiff may have in proving his allegations. (Ion Equip. Corp. v. Nelson (1980) 110 Cal.App.3d 868, 881.) A demurrer is properly sustained only when the complaint, liberally construed, fails to state facts sufficient to constitute any cause of action. (Kramer v. Intuit Inc. (2004) 121 Cal.App.4th 574, 578.)

“A cause of action for breach of contract requires pleading of a contract, plaintiff's performance or excuse for failure to perform, defendant's breach and damage to plaintiff resulting therefrom.” (Hale v. Sharp Healthcare (2010) 183 Cal.App.4th 1373, 1387.)

Plaintiff’s FAC alleges three causes of action against Hakobyan, for breach of written contract, breach of oral contract, and account stated.

Plaintiff’s claim for breach of written contract alleges that he entered into a Management Agreement with Hakobyan and A&H Management, Hakobyan’s company, under which Hakobyan and A&H “would act as the management company for the home health business operating under the Plaintiff’s license.” (FAC p. 4.) Plaintiff alleges that the defendants breached the agreement on September 1, 2022, by “mishandling accounts and payment of its liabilities and other obligations which can cause Plaintiff’s license with the California Health Board to fall out of good standing.” (Ibid.)

The copy of the Management Agreement attached to the FAC is made between Plaintiff and A&H. (FAC p. 22.) As Hakobyan is not a party to this contract, Plaintiff’s claim for breach of written contract against her fails.

Under the cause of action for breach of oral contract, Plaintiff alleges that he “sold his license to conduct a California Home Health Business to the Defendant for a total of $280,000. Defendant orally agreed to purchase the license and Defendant agreed to make monthly payments until the balance of the purchase price was paid off. Defendants, Davit Hakobyan and Pogos Tofalyan executed the contract. However, Defendant, Anna Hakobyan orally agreed to all terms of the Contract.” (FAC p. 6.) A copy of the written Stock Transfer Agreement between Plaintiff, Davit Hakobyan, and Tofalyan is attached to the FAC. The Court agrees with Defendants that the alleged oral agreement between Plaintiff and Anna Hakobyan is barred by the parol evidence rule.

“The parol evidence rule generally prohibits the introduction of any extrinsic evidence to vary or contradict the terms of an integrated written instrument. [Citation.] It is based upon the premise that the written instrument is the agreement of the parties. [Citation.] Its application involves a two part analysis: 1) was the writing intended to be an integration, i.e. a complete and final expression of the parties' agreement, precluding any evidence of collateral agreements [Citation]; and 2) is the agreement susceptible of the meaning contended for by the party offering the evidence?” (Gerdlund v. Electronic Dispensers International (1987) 190 Cal.App.3d 263, 270.)

“When the parties to a written contract have agreed to it as an ‘integration’—a complete and final embodiment of the terms of an agreement—parol evidence cannot be used to add to or vary its terms. . . . The crucial issue in determining whether there has been an integration is whether the parties intended their writing to serve as the exclusive embodiment of their agreement.” (Masterson v. Sine (1968) 68 Cal.2d 222, 225.)

Here, the attached Stock Transfer Agreement contains an integration clause that provides, “This Agreement . . . constitute[s] the entire agreement of the parties and supersede all prior agreements and undertakings, both written and oral, among the parties, or any of them, with respect to the subject matter hereof and, except as expressly provided herein, are not intended to confer upon any other Person any rights or remedies hereunder.” (FAC p. 15.) The Transfer Agreement’s integration clause contradicts the allegation that Hakobyan made a separate oral contract with Plaintiff to the same terms of the written agreement. The parol evidence rule does not “permit proof of a collateral agreement which contradicts an express provision of the written agreement,” because “it cannot reasonably be presumed that the parties intended to integrate two directly contradictory terms in the same agreement.” (Gerdlund, 190 Cal.App.3d at 271.)

Because Plaintiff’s claims against Hakobyan for breach of written contract and breach of oral contract both fail, Plaintiff’s second cause of action for account stated also fails as against Hakobyan.



Case Number: *******6723 Hearing Date: March 6, 2023 Dept: 30

Dept. 30

Calendar No.

Harutyunyan vs. Hakobyan, et. al., Case No. *******6723

Tentative Ruling re: Defendant’s Demurrer to First Amended Complaint

Defendant A&H Management (A&H) demurs to the First Amended Complaint of Plaintiff Karen Harutyunyan (Plaintiff). The demurrer is sustained with ten (10) days leave to amend.

In reviewing the legal sufficiency of a complaint against a demurrer, a court will treat the demurrer as admitting all material facts properly pleaded, but not contentions, deductions, or conclusions of law. (Blank v. Kirwan (1985) 39 Cal.3d 311, 318 (Blank); C & H Foods Co. v. Hartford Ins. Co. (1984) 163 Cal.App.3d 1055, 1062.) It is well settled that a “demurrer lies only for defects appearing on the face of the complaint[.]” (Stevens v. Superior Court (1999) 75 Cal.App.4th 594, 601.) “The rules by which the sufficiency of a complaint is tested against a general demurrer are well settled. We not only treat the demurrer as admitting all material facts properly pleaded, but also give the complaint a reasonable interpretation, reading it as a whole and its parts in their context.” (Guclimane Co. v. Stewart Title Guaranty Co. (1998) 19 Cal.4th 26, 38 (internal quotes omitted).) For purposes of ruling on a demurrer, the complaint must be construed liberally by drawing reasonable inferences from the facts pleaded. (Wilner v. Sunset Life Ins. Co. (2000) 78 Cal.App.4th 952, 958.)

When ruling on a demurrer, the Court may only consider the complaint’s allegations or matters which may be judicially noticed. (Blank, supra, 39 Cal.3d at p. 318.) The Court may not consider any other extrinsic evidence or judge the credibility of the allegations plead or the difficulty a plaintiff may have in proving his allegations. (Ion Equip. Corp. v. Nelson (1980) 110 Cal.App.3d 868, 881.) A demurrer is properly sustained only when the complaint, liberally construed, fails to state facts sufficient to constitute any cause of action. (Kramer v. Intuit Inc. (2004) 121 Cal.App.4th 574, 578.)

“A cause of action for breach of contract requires pleading of a contract, plaintiff's performance or excuse for failure to perform, defendant's breach and damage to plaintiff resulting therefrom.” (Hale v. Sharp Healthcare (2010) 183 Cal.App.4th 1373, 1387.)

Plaintiff’s FAC alleges one cause of action against A&H for Breach of Contract. (FAC p. 4.) Under this cause of action, Plaintiff alleges that she entered into a Management Agreement with Anna Hakobyan and A&H, Hakobyan’s company, under which Hakobyan and A&H “would act as the management company for the home health business operating under the Plaintiff’s license.” (Ibid.) Plaintiff alleges that the defendants breached the agreement on September 1, 2022, by “mishandling accounts and payment of its liabilities and other obligations which can cause Plaintiff’s license with the California Health Board to fall out of good standing.” A copy of the Management Agreement is attached to the FAC. (FAC p. 22.)

Plaintiff’s allegations are insufficient to support a cause of action for breach of contract against A&H. Contrary to Plaintiff’s argument, Plaintiff must allege facts regarding the conduct by Defendant constituting the breach. Without such facts, Plaintiff’s allegations are conclusory and fail to state the claim. (See Bentley v. Mountain (1942) 51 Cal.App.2d 95, 98 [“The allegations of the amended complaint to the effect that defendants ‘violated’ said contracts, or ‘caused the violation’ of said contracts by others, are mere conclusions of law which cannot strengthen the pleading in the absence of allegations of fact showing such violations.”].) Accordingly, the demurrer is sustained.