Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/07/2021 at 15:26:02 (UTC).

KAREN ELIZABETH PLEITEZ, ET AL. VS RJ'S DEMOLITION & DISPOSAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/19/2019 KAREN ELIZABETH PLEITEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RJ'S DEMOLITION DISPOSAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1568

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ESCOBAR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM KAREN ELIZABETH PLEITEZ RUBI

PLEITEZ KAREN ELIZABETH

PLEITEZ RINA

Defendants

NAVA ENRIQUE

RJ'S DEMOLITION & DISPOSAL A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLER DELANEY L.

Defendant Attorney

HALL ANN CATHERINE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/21/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

10/21/2020: Answer

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

2/25/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

3/18/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Proof of Personal Service

2/24/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/24/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/4/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

1/28/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

PI General Order

12/5/2019: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

12/5/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/19/2019: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2022
  • Hearing11/15/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • Hearing03/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • Hearing03/09/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Michael E. Whitaker, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by RJ'S Demolition & Disposal, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by RJ'S Demolition & Disposal, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by RJ'S Demolition & Disposal, a California Corporation (Defendant); Enrique Nava (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by RJ'S Demolition & Disposal, a California Corporation (Defendant); Enrique Nava (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Karen Elizabeth Pleitez (Plaintiff); Rubi Escobar, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Karen Elizabeth Pleitez (Plaintiff); Rina Pleitez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Karen Elizabeth Pleitez (Plaintiff); Rubi Escobar, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Karen Elizabeth Pleitez (Plaintiff); Rina Pleitez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Karen Elizabeth Pleitez (Plaintiff); Rubi Escobar, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Karen Elizabeth Pleitez (Plaintiff); Rina Pleitez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Karen Elizabeth Pleitez (Plaintiff); Rubi Escobar, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Karen Elizabeth Pleitez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Karen Elizabeth Pleitez (Plaintiff); Rubi Escobar, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Karen Elizabeth Pleitez (Plaintiff); Rina Pleitez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Karen Elizabeth Pleitez (Plaintiff); Rubi Escobar, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Karen Elizabeth Pleitez (Plaintiff); Rina Pleitez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RJ'S DEMOLITION & DISPOSAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER DELANEY L.