Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/01/2021 at 15:36:05 (UTC).

KAREN CHARLTON VS ABELICIA ARDIANO MIRANDA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 KAREN CHARLTON filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ABELICIA ARDIANO MIRANDA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9698

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHARLTON KAREN

Defendants

ARDIANO MIRANDA ABELICIA

COUGHLIN JAN ELIZABETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NORMAN PAULA R. ESQ.

Other Attorneys

NGUYEN MINH T. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ADDRESS FOR ELECTRONIC SERVICE

12/30/2020: Notice - NOTICE PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF ADDRESS FOR ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/30/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/30/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2023
  • Hearing12/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • Hearing06/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • Hearing06/15/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Karen Charlton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketNotice (Plaintiff's Notice of Address for Electronic Service); Filed by Karen Charlton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Karen Charlton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Karen Charlton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NGUYEN MINH T.