This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2019 at 22:27:53 (UTC).

KAREN BARBOSA ET AL VS LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/05/2017 KAREN BARBOSA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5928

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BARBOSA RANDY

BARBOSA KAREN

Defendants

LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT INC.

TOOMA M.D. GHASSAN

CORONA-TEMECULA ORTHOPAEDIC ASSOCIATES

ELITE SHOW SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ELITE SHOW SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DOE 3

CONTEMPORARY SERVICES CORPORATION DOE 2

GHALAMBOR M.D. NAVID DOE 1

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MITTELMAN JOHN ROBERT

Defendant Attorneys

MCKENNA ROBERT LOWELL III

HEWITT STEPHEN LEWIS

MARTIN SIDNEY JERALD

 

Court Documents

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/8/2018: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

2/8/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

Unknown

2/8/2018: Unknown

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

2/20/2018: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

DEFENDANT NAVID GHALAMBOR, M.D.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

3/22/2018: DEFENDANT NAVID GHALAMBOR, M.D.'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

3/29/2018: Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint

Exhibit List

11/9/2018: Exhibit List

Request for Judicial Notice

11/9/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Notice

11/9/2018: Notice

Notice of Motion

11/9/2018: Notice of Motion

Other -

12/14/2018: Other -

Motion for Summary Judgment

12/14/2018: Motion for Summary Judgment

Opposition

2/13/2019: Opposition

Opposition

2/13/2019: Opposition

Request for Dismissal

2/20/2019: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

2/28/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

2/28/2019: Minute Order

Order

3/6/2019: Order

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Elite Show Services, Inc., a California corporation (Doe 3) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (to Continue Trial Date) - Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Hearing on Ex Parte Application to C...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketJudgment (- Summary Judgment - Before Trial - 05/21/2019 entered for Defendant Tooma, M.D., Ghassan; Defendant Corona-Temecula Orthopaedic Associates Medical Group against Plaintiff Barbosa, Randy; Plaintiff Barbosa, Karen.); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketJudgment (Summary Judgment Under CCP 437c); Filed by Ghalambor, M.D., Navid (Doe 1) (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Karen Barbosa (Plaintiff); Randy Barbosa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Corona-Temecula Orthopaedic Associates (Defendant); M.D., Ghassan Tooma (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Corona-Temecula Orthopaedic Associates (Defendant); M.D., Ghassan Tooma (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Karen Barbosa (Plaintiff); Randy Barbosa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Karen Barbosa (Plaintiff); Randy Barbosa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Karen Barbosa (Plaintiff); Randy Barbosa (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****5928    Hearing Date: November 04, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – CENTRAL DISTRICT

KAREN BARBOSA, ET AL.,

Plaintiff,

v.

LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT, INC., ET AL.,

Defendants.

Case No.: ****5928

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

After review of the court file, the Court makes the following order:

Department 3 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE CENTRAL DISTRICT, JUDGE HOLLY FUJIE presiding in DEPT. 56 of the STANLEY MOSK Courthouse, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.

DATED: November 4, 2019 ___________________________

Hon. Jon Takasugi

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ELITE SHOW SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where LIVE NATION ENTERTAINMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARTIN SIDNEY J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEWITT STEPHEN