This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2021 at 10:42:14 (UTC).

KAREN ANN FAN VS MACERICH LAKEWOOD LP, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 KAREN ANN FAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MACERICH LAKEWOOD LP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9951

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FAN KAREN ANN

Defendants

MACERICH LAKEWOOD GP LLC

MACERICH LAKEWOOD LP

INTERSTATE CLEANING CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZEYTUNTSYAN ANDREW

Defendant Attorney

GARRELL PETER E.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/27/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/27/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/27/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/27/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

6/9/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Proof of Personal Service

9/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/1/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/15/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

9/27/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/27/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2024
  • Hearing05/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Hearing11/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • Hearing11/10/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Macerich Lakewood LP (Defendant); Interstate Cleaning Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Macerich Lakewood LP (Defendant); Interstate Cleaning Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Karen Ann Fan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Karen Ann Fan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Karen Ann Fan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Karen Ann Fan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Karen Ann Fan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Karen Ann Fan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Macerich Lakewood GP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MACERICH LAKEWOOD LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where INTERSTATE CLEANING CORPORATION is a litigant