This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/20/2021 at 10:28:47 (UTC).

KAREN A. JONES, ET AL. VS AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/31/2020 KAREN A JONES filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against AIR LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9263

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

JONES KAREN A.

JONES PHILLIP

JONES PATRICIA

Defendants

AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION

VIACOMCBS INC. FKA CBS CORPORATION FKA VIACOM INC. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION SUED INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO BF STURTEVANT

FLOWSERVE US INC.

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

WEIR VALVE & CONTROLS USA INC. FKA ATWOOD & MORRILL

THE WM. POWELL COMPANY

ITT CORPORATION

SYD CARPENTER MARINE CONTRACTOR INC.

FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC

ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY CO. INC.

SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA INC. FKA SQUARE D COMPANY

PARKER-HANNIFAN CORPORATION

WARREN PUMPS LLC

VIACOMCBS INC. FKA CBS CORPORATION FKA VIACOM INC. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION FKA WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

FROST SCOTT L

FROST SCOTT L ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

MILBRODT JEREMY DAVID

BERGSTROM EMILY DIANE

SHAFFER D SCOTT

NICHOLS STEPHEN MATTHEW

KUM ROBERT

PIETRYKOWSKI MICHAEL J.

BROSAMLE ANTHONY DEAN

CALARESO CHRISTINE DIANNE

KELLY DANIEL JAMES

PATTERSON CHRISTOPHER SEAN

MILBRODT JEREMY DAVID ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

9/24/2020: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Answer

9/24/2020: Answer

Answer

10/5/2020: Answer

Request for Dismissal

9/9/2020: Request for Dismissal

Demand for Jury Trial - DEFENDANT SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.'S DEMAND FOR A JURY TRIAL

9/22/2020: Demand for Jury Trial - DEFENDANT SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA, INC.'S DEMAND FOR A JURY TRIAL

Answer

9/22/2020: Answer

Answer

9/24/2020: Answer

Answer

9/24/2020: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial - DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

9/25/2020: Demand for Jury Trial - DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLC'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Answer

9/25/2020: Answer

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

9/30/2020: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Answer

8/28/2020: Answer

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

9/2/2020: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

9/2/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

8/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/07/2020

8/7/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/07/2020

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/31/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketDefendant The William Powell Company's Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by The WM. Powell Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by The WM. Powell Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDefendant Warren Pumps, LLC's Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Warren Pumps, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketAnswer to Complaint for Damages (Wrongful Death) - Asbestos; Filed by Warren Pumps, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Flowserve US, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketParker-Hannifin Corporation's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint; Filed by Parker-Hannifan Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDefendant Union Carbide Corporation's Answer to Complaint for Wrongful Death and Survival Action- Asbestos; Filed by Union Carbide Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Without Prejudice); Filed by Karen A. Jones (Plaintiff); Patricia Jones (Plaintiff); Phillip Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Schneider Electric USA, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Syd Carpenter Marine Contractor, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/07/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Karen A. Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Karen A. Jones As Successor-In-Interest to John L. Jones ( Code of Civ. Proc. Section 377.32); Filed by Karen A. Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Karen A. Jones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC USA INC. FKA SQUARE D COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ELLIOT COMPANY AKA ELLIOT TURBOMACHINERY CO. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where VIACOMCBS INC. FKA CBS CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION FKA VIACOM INC. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BF STURTEVANT is a litigant