Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/29/2021 at 11:50:52 (UTC).

KAREEM T. HASSAAN VS TIMMY H. TROUNG, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/31/2018 KAREEM T HASSAAN filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against TIMMY H TROUNG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5280

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HASSAAN KAREEM T.

Defendants

TROUNG TIMMY H.

TROUNG DANIEL H.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RICHTER MICHAEL P

Defendant Attorney

LUONG MINH HIEU THI

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SEEK ...)

8/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SEEK ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SEEK ...) OF 08/28/2020

8/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO SEEK ...) OF 08/28/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

7/13/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 07/13/2020

7/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 07/13/2020

Case Management Statement

7/10/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/18/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

3/20/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Notice of Reclassification

3/20/2020: Notice of Reclassification

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/24/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Mail

3/26/2020: Proof of Service by Mail

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • Docketat 10:35 AM in Department 56; Non-Appearance Case Review (reDismissal for Failure to Seek Default) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Dismissal for Failure to Seek ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Dismissal for Failure to Seek ...) of 08/28/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • Docketat 10:25 AM in Department 56; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 07/13/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Kareem T. Hassaan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Kareem T. Hassaan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Kareem T. Hassaan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Kareem T. Hassaan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Amended Complaint (1st)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kareem T. Hassaan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kareem T. Hassaan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketComplaint ( (1st)); Filed by Kareem T. Hassaan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUONG MINH HIEU THI