This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2019 at 01:43:07 (UTC).

KAREEM IBRAHIM VS BRYAN COOPER

Case Summary

On 04/18/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by KAREEM IBRAHIM against BRYAN COOPER in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2991

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

IBRAHIM KAREEM

Respondents and Defendants

DOES 1 TO 10 INCLUSIVE

COOPER BRYAN

 

Court Documents

CoverSheet

4/18/2018: CoverSheet

CoverSheet

4/18/2018: CoverSheet

Complaint

4/18/2018: Complaint

Summons

4/18/2018: Summons

DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

6/29/2018: DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

DEFENDANT'S DEMAND FOR A TRIAL BY JURY

6/29/2018: DEFENDANT'S DEMAND FOR A TRIAL BY JURY

Association of Attorney

5/17/2019: Association of Attorney

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2019
  • Association of Attorney; Filed by Bryan Cooper (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • Answer; Filed by Bryan Cooper (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DEFENDANT'S DEMAND FOR A TRIAL BY JURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Bryan Cooper (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Kareem Ibrahim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Summons; Filed by Kareem Ibrahim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC702991    Hearing Date: January 15, 2020    Dept: 28

Motion to Consolidate

Having considered the moving papers, the Court rules as follows.

BACKGROUND

In BC702991, on April 18, 2018, Plaintiff Kareem Ibrahim filed a complaint against Defendant Bryan Cooper alleging motor vehicle and general negligence for an automobile collision that occurred on February 7, 2018.

In 18STCV05211, on November 14, 2018, Plaintiff Viktoria Baklan filed a complaint against Defendant Bryan Cooper alleging motor vehicle and general negligence for an automobile collision that occurred on February 7, 2018.

In BC702991, on October 25, 2019, the Court deemed case number BC702991 as related to case number 18STCV05211.

In 18STCV05211, on November 6, 2019, Defendant/Cross-Complainant Bryan Cooper filed a cross-complaint against Cross-Complainant Kareem Ibrahim seeking indemnity, apportionment, and declaratory relief.

In BC702991, on November 27, 2019, Defendant Bryan Cooper filed a motion to consolidate case number BC702991 with case number 18STCV05211 pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure section 1048.

In BC702991, trial is set for July 13, 2020.

In 18STCV05211, trial is set for May 13, 2020.

PARTYS REQUEST

Defendant Bryan Cooper asks the Court to consolidate case number BC702991 with case number 18STCV05211 because they involve the same automobile collision.

LEGAL STANDARD

California Code of Civil Procedure section 1048 states: “When actions involving a common question of law or fact are pending before the court, it may order a joint hearing or trial of any or all the matters in issue in the actions; it may order all the actions consolidated and it may make such orders concerning proceedings therein as may tend to avoid unnecessary costs or delay.”

Under California Rules of Court, rule 3.350, subdivision (a)(1), a notice of motion to consolidate must: (A) List all named parties in each case, the names of those who have appeared, and the names of their respective attorneys of record; (B) Contain the captions of all the cases sought to be consolidated, with the lowest numbered case shown first; and (C) Be filed in each case sought to be consolidated. (2) The motion to consolidate: (A) Is deemed a single motion for the purpose of determining the appropriate filing fee, but memorandums, declarations, and other supporting papers must be filed only in the lowest numbered case; (B) Must be served on all attorneys of record and all non-represented parties in all of the cases sought to be consolidated; and (C) Must have a proof of service filed as part of the motion.

DISCUSSION

The Court finds California Rules of Court, rule 3.350 has been complied with.

The Court also finds there to be good cause to avoid unnecessary costs and delay in consolidating these actions.  Both of these actions involve similar parties and relate to the same vehicle collision that occurred on February 7, 2018.  As such, it is in the interest of efficiency to consolidate the two actions.

The motion is GRANTED.

The Court orders that cases BC702991 and 18STCV05211 are consolidated.  BC702991 is designated as the lead case.  (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.350, subd. (b).) (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.350, subd. (d).)

Defendant Bryan Cooper is ordered to give notice of this ruling.