This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/26/2022 at 21:24:40 (UTC).

KARAPET TERTERYAN VS YULYA YOUSOFI

Case Summary

On 06/15/2021 KARAPET TERTERYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against YULYA YOUSOFI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2330

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TERTERYAN KARAPET

Defendant

YOUSOFI YULYA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SALLE WILLIAM FREDERICK

Defendant Attorney

PATTON CHRISTOPHER LYNN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/15/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/15/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

6/25/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

6/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/16/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

9/16/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/3/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Change of Firm Name

12/7/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Name

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2024
  • Hearing06/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • Hearing12/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • Hearing11/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by YULYA YOUSOFI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by YULYA YOUSOFI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by YULYA YOUSOFI (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by KARAPET TERTERYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by KARAPET TERTERYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by KARAPET TERTERYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KARAPET TERTERYAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PATTON CHRISTOPHER LYNN