This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2022 at 02:02:36 (UTC).

KANE, MICHAEL - MINOR'S COMPROMISE

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 KANE, MICHAEL - MINOR'S COMPROMISE was filed as a Probate - Minor Compromise Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SMALL, MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1670

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Minor Compromise Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SMALL, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LARA VALERIE

Interested Party

LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

THAMMALAIVIROJ PATTY

 

Court Documents

Proposed Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

2/22/2022: Proposed Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited)

2/22/2022: Petition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited)

Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

3/2/2022: Order - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

3/2/2022: Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

Minute Order

4/28/2022: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • Hearing07/06/2022 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 5 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 5, Small, Michael, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Hearing - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketOrder - Approving Compromise of Claim (Expedited)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketOrder - Deposit Funds Expedited

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • DocketDISP: Expedited Minor's Compromise Approved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketProposed Order - Deposit Funds Expedited

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketPetition - Approve Minor's Compromise (Expedited); Filed by Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOYA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant