Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2021 at 18:52:06 (UTC).

KAMYAR RASHIDIDDOUST VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/25/2021 KAMYAR RASHIDIDDOUST filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1512

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RASHIDIDDOUST KAMYAR

RASHIDIDOUST KAMYAR

Defendants

GENERAL MOTORS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STARR ROBERT LORNE

Defendant Attorney

DAVIS STACEY S

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

6/30/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/30/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

7/1/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

7/2/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Personal Service

4/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/14/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/25/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • Hearing07/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 78 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by General Motors LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by General Motors LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Kamyar Rashididoust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Kamyar Rashididoust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Kamyar Rashididoust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Kamyar Rashididoust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kamyar Rashididoust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Kamyar Rashididoust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIS STACEY S