This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2019 at 03:01:36 (UTC).

KAMYAR R SHAYAN ESQ VS ANGELICA MAZARIEGOS ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/07/2017 KAMYAR R SHAYAN ESQ filed an Other lawsuit against ANGELICA MAZARIEGOS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RICHARD FRUIN and RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6852

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RICHARD FRUIN

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

SHAYAN KAMYAR R. ESQ.

Defendants and Appellants

SPINE CARE AND ORTHOPEDIC PHYSICIANS

C&C FACTORING SOLUTIONS

REGIONAL IMAGING SERVICES

MAZARIEGOS ANGELICA

HESS REHABILITATION & CHIROPRACTIC CENTER

DOE CORPORATIONS 51 TO 100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

SHAYAN KAMYAR R. ESQ.

Appellant Attorneys

HERZOG IAN ISAAC

ABITANTA SUSAN E.

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

LIN PAUL P. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

1/11/2018: Unknown

Unknown

1/11/2018: Unknown

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/15/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/15/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

2/20/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

2/20/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

Minute Order

4/3/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING

4/9/2018: NOTICE OF RULING

Minute Order

5/24/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/4/2018: Minute Order

JUDGMFNT

6/14/2018: JUDGMFNT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

6/19/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Unknown

7/20/2018: Unknown

Unknown

7/20/2018: Unknown

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF ROBERT MIN, DC, AND IAN HERZOG RESERVATION ID #180722333351

7/25/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF ROBERT MIN, DC, AND IAN HERZOG RESERVATION ID #180722333351

OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT

8/17/2018: OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT

DEFENDANTS SPINE CARE & ORTHOPEDIC PHYSICIANS AND C&C FACTORING SOLUTIONS' REPLY RE: MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF SUSAN E. ABITANTA

8/23/2018: DEFENDANTS SPINE CARE & ORTHOPEDIC PHYSICIANS AND C&C FACTORING SOLUTIONS' REPLY RE: MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT; DECLARATION OF SUSAN E. ABITANTA

Minute Order

8/30/2018: Minute Order

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketAppeal Record Delivered; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (B293857;); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketAppeal - Court Reporter Waiver of Transcript Deposit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketAppeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103 (Reporter's); Filed by C&C Factoring Solutions (Appellant); Spine Care and Orthopedic Physicians (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Default; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed; Filed by C&C Factoring Solutions (Appellant); Spine Care and Orthopedic Physicians (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Docketat 08:31 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Judgment (CCP 473.5) (By Defendants Spine Care & Orthopedic Physicians and C&C Factoring Solutions [180722333351]) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Jennifer Tat, 13773)

    Read MoreRead Less
78 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Kamyar R. Shayan, Esq. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT IN INTERPLEADER PER CCP 386(B) ET SEQ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

. - 3 T I . i ooy L S

. oAaq B | FILE Paul P. Lin, Esq., SBN 248195 § Suggrior C!)%n'%f[gamomia

7700 Irvine Center Drive, Ste. 800 * untv of Los Angeles

' Irvine, CA 92618 |

M DEC 08 2017

Attorney for Defendant I R. Cagieor s . ‘ Spine Care & Orthopedic Physicians . Q756 OffcerCrer ' ! - Deputy

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Case No. BC 656852

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT IN

INTERPLEADER PER CCP § 386 (B) et seq.

KAMYAR R. SHAYAN, ESQ. dba LAW OFFICES OF KAMYAR R. SHAYAN, a. Professional Law Corporation,

HESS REHABILITATION & CHIROPRACTIC

CENTERS, a business entity, form unknown:; Does 1-50; CORPORATIONS 51 through 100;

- N O n

Defendants In Interpleader.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REGIONAL IMAGING SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where C&C FACTORING SOLUTIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where SCHIFFMAN MICHAEL L. M.D. - DOCTOR OF MEDICINE DBA SPINE CARE & ORTHOPEDIC PHYSICAINS is a litigant

Latest cases where HESS REHABILITATION AND CHIROPRACTIC CENTERS INC. is a litigant