This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/02/2020 at 01:32:35 (UTC).

KAMREN BURROUGH ET. AL. VS. BEVERLY JANE ADAMS, ET. AL.

Case Summary

On 05/15/2017 KAMREN BURROUGH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BEVERLY JANE ADAMS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRIAN C. YEP. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7132

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRIAN C. YEP

 

Party Details

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

PALMDALE SCHOOL DISTRICT

SANTA BARBARA TRANSPORTATION

ADAMS BEVERLY JANE

URREA PERLA

STUDENT TRASNPORTATION OF AMERICA

STUDENT TRANSPORTATION OF AMERICA

Other and Not Classified By Court

TUCKER THERESA

Minor

BURROUGH KAMREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

DEMAIO MICHELLE B

DEMAIO MICHELLE MARIE

QUIST KELSEY ELIZABETH

WALSH DANIEL

BALATERO DHAVE K

Not Classified By Court Attorney

CAMPANO ANGELO FELICE

Minor Attorney

CAMPANO ANGELO F.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/21/2020: Request for Dismissal

Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

9/21/2020: Receipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account

Notice of Ruling

8/7/2020: Notice of Ruling

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DHAVE K. BALATERO AS TO NON- APPEARANCE AT OSC RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT INTO A BLOCKED ACCOUNT AND OSC RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT

8/7/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DHAVE K. BALATERO AS TO NON- APPEARANCE AT OSC RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT INTO A BLOCKED ACCOUNT AND OSC RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); ORDER TO SHOW...)

8/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); ORDER TO SHOW...)

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

6/9/2020: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - ORDER APPROVING COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PROCEEDS OF JUDGM

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

6/9/2020: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

6/9/2020: Expedited Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proc - EXPEDITED PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF DISPUTED CLAIM OR PENDING ACTION OR DISPOSITION OF PRO

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

4/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 04/15/2020

4/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 04/15/2020

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

2/6/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

1/31/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING FOLLOWING FEBRUARY 5, 2020 FSC

2/5/2020: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING FOLLOWING FEBRUARY 5, 2020 FSC

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] GRANTING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT APPLICATION

1/7/2020: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] GRANTING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT APPLICATION

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

1/8/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

1/14/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

1/15/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Deposit Into a Blocked Account) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Kamren Burrough (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by Kamren Burrough (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Deposit Into a Blocked Account) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Order to Show...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Kamren Burrough (Plaintiff); Theresa Tucker (Non-Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (OF DHAVE K. BALATERO AS TO NON- APPEARANCE AT OSC RE: PROOF OF DEPOSIT INTO A BLOCKED ACCOUNT AND OSC RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT); Filed by Beverly Jane Adams (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department A14, Brian C. Yep, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Deposit Into a Blocked Account) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Theresa Tucker (Non-Party); Kamren Burrough (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • DocketSECOND AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE PI COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Santa Barbara Transportation Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where STUDENT TRANSPORTATION OF AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PALMDALE SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAMPANO ANGELO