Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/27/2021 at 09:45:33 (UTC).

KAMBOD, OLGA A. VS KAMBOD, HADI

Case Summary

On 12/22/2020 KAMBOD, OLGA A filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against KAMBOD, HADI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ARIAN, LEE S., SWIFT, DAVID W. and SILBERMAN, HARVEY A.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6905

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ARIAN, LEE S.

SWIFT, DAVID W.

SILBERMAN, HARVEY A.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

KAMBOD OLGA A.

Respondent

KAMBOD HADI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COHEN ASHTON S.

Respondent Attorney

ROSENTHAL LISA FRANCINE

 

Court Documents

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

3/18/2021: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

3/18/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Minute Order

3/18/2021: Minute Order

Declaration - of Liliya Russin in Support of Petitioner's Request for DVRO

3/19/2021: Declaration - of Liliya Russin in Support of Petitioner's Request for DVRO

Notice - Limited Scope Representation - Ashton S. Cohen for 3/18/2021 Hearing

3/19/2021: Notice - Limited Scope Representation - Ashton S. Cohen for 3/18/2021 Hearing

Proof of Service

3/19/2021: Proof of Service

Declaration - in Support of Request for DVRO

3/19/2021: Declaration - in Support of Request for DVRO

Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

2/25/2021: Notice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

2/25/2021: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

2/25/2021: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Minute Order

2/25/2021: Minute Order

Minute Order

2/4/2021: Minute Order

Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

1/12/2021: Request to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115)

Declaration

1/12/2021: Declaration

Minute Order

1/12/2021: Minute Order

Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

12/22/2020: Request - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

12/22/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

12/22/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2021
  • Hearing05/20/2021 at 8:30 AM in Department L at 300 East Walnut St., Pasadena, CA 91101; Restraining Order Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid A; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Liliya Russin in Support of Petitioner's Request for DVRO ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice - Limited Scope Representation (Amended ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (Electronic ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Tatiana Sungatullina ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice - Limited Scope Representation (Ashton S. Cohen for 3/18/2021 Hearing ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (in Support of Request for DVRO ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department L, Silberman, Harvey A., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNunc Pro Tunc Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 25, Arian, Lee S., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDeclaration; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/o Minor Child (Case Initiation); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENTHAL LISA F