This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2023 at 06:06:14 (UTC).

KAMAYA DUNN VS CORINTHIAN INTERNATIONAL PARKING LA, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/13/2022 KAMAYA DUNN filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CORINTHIAN INTERNATIONAL PARKING LA, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER, DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III and MAREN NELSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9143

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

MAREN NELSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUNN KAMAYA

Defendants

CORINTHIAN INTERNATIONAL PARKING LA INC.

CORINTHIAN INTERNATIONAL PARKING SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BIBIYAN DAVID D.

KLEIN JEFFREY D.

WALLIN ALEXANDER D.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

7/12/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Unknown - APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF PROCESS ON THE CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE ON BEHALF OF CORINTHIAN INTERNATIONAL PARKING LA, INC.; DECLARATION OF FELIPE GOMEZ

5/17/2023: Unknown - APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER AUTHORIZING SERVICE OF PROCESS ON THE CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE ON BEHALF OF CORINTHIAN INTERNATIONAL PARKING LA, INC.; DECLARATION OF FELIPE GOMEZ

Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER

5/17/2023: Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER

Proof of Service by Mail

4/21/2023: Proof of Service by Mail

Amended Complaint - SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

4/17/2023: Amended Complaint - SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/17/2023: Stipulation and Order - JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing - NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/30/2023: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing - NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION FOR ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR:

3/6/2023: Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR:

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/16/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE)

Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

2/9/2023: Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE STATUS CONFERENCE

12/9/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING OCTOBER 6, 2022, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

10/13/2022: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING REGARDING OCTOBER 6, 2022, INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Order - ORDER .AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

10/13/2022: Order - ORDER .AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

10/6/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Status Conference Statement - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

10/4/2022: Status Conference Statement - INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT

Status Conference Statement

9/30/2022: Status Conference Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/20/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice - NOTICE OF SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

9/1/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF SETTING INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2023
  • Hearing11/20/2023 at 2:00 PM in Department 10 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Further Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketFurther Status Conference scheduled for 11/20/2023 at 02:00 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Further Status Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Further Status Conference scheduled for 07/12/2023 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 10 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 11/20/2023 02:00 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Application For An Order Authorizing Service Of Process On The California Secretary Of State On Behalf Of Corinthian International Parking La, Inc. Declaration Of Felipe Gomez: Filed By: Kamaya Dunn (Plaintiff); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 05/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketApplication For An Order Authorizing Service Of Process On The California Secretary Of State On Behalf Of Corinthian International Parking La, Inc. Declaration Of Felipe Gomez; Filed by: Kamaya Dunn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Order: Status Date changed from 05/17/2023 to 05/17/2023 ; Name Extension changed from [PROPOSED] ORDER to ORDER ; Exact Name changed from [Proposed] Order to Order ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • Docket[Proposed] Order; Signed and Filed by: Kamaya Dunn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: Kamaya Dunn (Plaintiff); As to: Corinthian International Parking LA, Inc. (Defendant); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketSecond Amended Class Action Complaint; Filed by: Kamaya Dunn (Plaintiff); As to: Corinthian International Parking LA, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kamaya Dunn (Plaintiff); As to: Corinthian International Parking LA, Inc. (Defendant); Corinthian International Parking Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maren Nelson in Department 17 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kamaya Dunn (Plaintiff); As to: Corinthian International Parking LA, Inc. (Defendant); Corinthian International Parking Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kamaya Dunn (Plaintiff); As to: Corinthian International Parking LA, Inc. (Defendant); Corinthian International Parking Services, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less