This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/25/2019 at 04:05:11 (UTC).

KAMARIE QUINONES ET AL VS KRISHNA NARAYANAN M D ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/17/2017 KAMARIE QUINONES filed an Other lawsuit against KRISHNA NARAYANAN M D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7206

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Guardian Ad Litem

QUINONES RAQUEL

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 - 25

PIH HEALTH

PIH HEALTH DOWNEY MEDICAL GROUP INC.

NARAYANAN KRISHNA M.D.

PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL-DOWNEY

Minor

QUINONES KAMARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OGBOGU SAMUEL O. ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

DOBSON MITZIE L.

VILLEBRO JENNIFER KAY ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

5/2/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY-CIVIL

5/18/2018: SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY-CIVIL

APPUCATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL EXPARTE

6/18/2018: APPUCATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL EXPARTE

NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM EX PARTE

6/25/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM EX PARTE

Minute Order

7/3/2018: Minute Order

SUMMONS

8/13/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT FOR PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

8/13/2018: COMPLAINT FOR PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

STIPULATION TO STRIKE ?CARELESS, RECKLESS, AND UNLAWFUL? FROM PARAGRAPHS 20, 21, 22, 23, AND 24 OF PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE (MEDICAL MALPRACTICE) AS TO DEFENDANT

9/27/2018: STIPULATION TO STRIKE ?CARELESS, RECKLESS, AND UNLAWFUL? FROM PARAGRAPHS 20, 21, 22, 23, AND 24 OF PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE (MEDICAL MALPRACTICE) AS TO DEFENDANT

ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION FILED CONCURRENTLY HEREWITH

9/27/2018: ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION FILED CONCURRENTLY HEREWITH

Minute Order

10/9/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/9/2018: Minute Order

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/30/2018: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Minute Order

12/6/2018: Minute Order

Notice

12/13/2018: Notice

Minute Order

1/17/2019: Minute Order

Answer

1/24/2019: Answer

Minute Order

3/8/2019: Minute Order

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - EX PARTE

1/16/2017: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - EX PARTE

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (To Continue Trial by Defendant) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Continue Trial by Defendant)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Stipulation and Order (TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC [AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES] PERSONAL INJURY COURTS ONLY (CENTRAL DISTRICT); Filed by PIH Health-Whittier Erroneously Sued As PIH Health Downey Medical Group, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Answer; Filed by PIH Health Hospital-Downey (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal or Proof of Service as to Unserved Defendant PIH Health Downey Medical Group, Inc., dba PIH Health) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause RE: Dismissal or Proof of Service as to U...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Notice (Notice Of Order To Show Cause); Filed by Kamarie Quinones (Plaintiff); Raquel Quinones (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal or Proof of Service as to Unserved Defendant PIH Health Downey Medical Group, Inc., dba PIH Health) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2018
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION -APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR PROFESSIONAL NEGLIGENCE (MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2017
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM - EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC647206    Hearing Date: February 06, 2020    Dept: SEC

QUINONES v. NARAYANAN, M.D.

CASE NO.: BC647206

HEARING: 02/06/2020

#4

TENTATIVE ORDER

I. Defendant PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL – WHITTIER’s unopposed motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. CCP § 437c.

II. Defendant KRISHNA NARAYANAN’s unopposed motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. CCP § 437c.

Moving Party(s) to give notice.

No Opposition(s) filed as of February 3, 2020. The Court notes that Plaintiff’s former counsel’s Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel was GRANTED on September 19, 2019. As of February 3, 2020, no Substitution of Attorney has been filed.

This action for medical malpractice was filed by Plaintiff on January 17, 2017.

Defendants PIH HEALTH HOSPITAL – WHITTER (“PIH”) and KRISHNA NARAYANAN, M.D. (“Narayanan”) (collectively “Defendants”) separately move for summary judgment pursuant to CCP §437c.

“[I]n any medical malpractice action, the plaintiff must establish: ‘(1) the duty of the professional to use such skill, prudence, and diligence as other members of his profession commonly possess and exercise; (2) a breach of that duty; (3) a proximate causal connection between the negligent conduct and the resulting injury; and (4) actual loss or damage resulting from the professional’s negligence.’ [Citation Omitted.]” (Gami v. Mullikin Medical Center (1993) Cal.App.4th 870, 877.)

The standard of care in a medical malpractice case requires that physicians exercise in diagnosis and treatment that reasonable degree of skill, knowledge and care ordinarily possessed and exercised by members of the medical profession under similar circumstances. (Mann. v. Cracchiolo (1985) 38 Cal.3d 18, 36.) “The standard of care against which the acts of a physician are to be measured is a matter peculiarly within the knowledge of experts; it presents the basic issue in a malpractice action and can only be proved by their testimony [citations], unless the conduct required by the particular circumstances is within the common knowledge of the layman.’ [Citations.]” (Landeros v. Flood (1976) 17 Cal.3d 399, 410.) Therefore, when a defendant moves for summary judgment/adjudication of a medical malpractice cause of action, and supports the motion with expert declarations that the defendant’s conduct fell within the community standard of care, that defendant is entitled to summary judgment unless the plaintiff comes forward with conflicting expert evidence.” (Munro v. Regents of California (1989) 215 Cal.App.3d 977, 984-985.)

PIH proffers the declaration of Robert E. Cole, M.D. in support of its instant motion for summary judgment. Dr. Cole is board-certified in General Surgery and, licensed to practice medicine in the State of California. (Cole Decl., ¶¶1-3.). Dr. Cole opines that the care and treatment provided to Plaintiff by PIH was within the applicable standard of care. (Cole Decl., ¶¶33-45.)

Narayanan proffers the declaration of Frank C. Candela, M.D. in support of his instant motion for summary judgment. Dr. Candela is board-certified in General Surgery and, licensed to practice medicine in the State of California. (Candela Decl., ¶¶1-5.). Dr. Candela opines that the care and treatment provided to Plaintiff by Naryanan was within the applicable standard of care. (Candela Decl., ¶¶25-37.)

As the motions are unopposed, Plaintiff submits no evidence to refute Defendants’ arguments.

Based on the evidence presented, the Court finds that there are no triable issues of material fact as to whether Defendants PIH and Narayanan breached the standard of care. The motions for summary judgment are granted.