This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/23/2022 at 10:55:50 (UTC).

KAMARIA BUCKLEY VS NIELS FRANCIS COSME, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 KAMARIA BUCKLEY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against NIELS FRANCIS COSME,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK E. WINDHAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3461

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK E. WINDHAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BUCKLEY KAMARIA

Defendants

COSME NIELS FRANCIS

EMKAY INC.

NEUTRON HOLDINGS INC. DBA LIME

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LERMAN STEVEN A.

Defendant Attorney

ANVARI SEPENTA ERIC

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE ORDER GRANTING JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL IN ORDER TO PARTICIPATE IN MEDIATION

10/14/2022: Notice - NOTICE ORDER GRANTING JOINT EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL IN ORDER TO PARTICIPATE IN MEDIATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL IN ORDER TO...)

10/12/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL IN ORDER TO...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL IN ORDER TO PARTICIPATE IN MEDIATION

10/11/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL IN ORDER TO PARTICIPATE IN MEDIATION

Request for Dismissal

4/22/2022: Request for Dismissal

Demand for Jury Trial

4/28/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

5/27/2022: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/1/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Personal Service

3/30/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Answer

11/5/2021: Answer

Answer

10/20/2021: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

10/25/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

10/25/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Personal Service

9/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

7/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

7/6/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2024
  • Hearing06/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • Hearing04/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • Hearing03/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketNotice Order Granting Joint Ex Parte Application to Continue Trial in Order to Participate in Mediation; Filed by: Niels Francis Cosme (Defendant); EMKAY, Inc. (Defendant); As to: Niels Francis Cosme (Defendant); EMKAY, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application To Continue Trial in Order to Participate in Mediation: Filed By: Niels Francis Cosme (Defendant),Neutron Holdings Inc. (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 10/12/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 03/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Continue Trial in Order to...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application To Continue Trial in Order to Participate in Mediation scheduled for 10/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 updated: Result Date to 10/12/2022; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 03/24/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 12/07/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/21/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/19/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Kamaria Buckley (Plaintiff); As to: Niels Francis Cosme (Defendant); EMKAY, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Kamaria Buckley (Plaintiff); As to: Niels Francis Cosme (Defendant); EMKAY, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Kamaria Buckley (Plaintiff); As to: Niels Francis Cosme (Defendant); EMKAY, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Emkay, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where NEUTRON HOLDINGS INC. DBA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANVARI ERIC LAW OFFICES OF