This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/19/2021 at 09:09:43 (UTC).

KAMA CONSTANCE FIELDS, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL. VS WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 KAMA CONSTANCE FIELDS, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC, A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5653

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MUHAMMAD A MINOR BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM KAMA CONSTANCE FIELDS KARIMAH

FIELDS AN INDIVIDUAL KAMA CONSTANCE

Defendant

WILLIAM PENN VENTURES LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GIBALEVICH DANIEL

GIBALEVICH DANIEL ANDREW

Defendant Attorneys

FIELDS GARY D.

CANADA RICHARD BRENT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/8/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/8/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/8/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/14/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

7/14/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/14/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/14/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/30/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Demand for Jury Trial

7/30/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

7/30/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

7/28/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

10/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

Substitution of Attorney

10/14/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Case Management Statement

10/14/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/13/2020: Case Management Statement

Request for Dismissal

1/28/2021: Request for Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by KAMA CONSTANCE FIELDS, an individual (Plaintiff); KARIMAH MUHAMMAD, a minor by and through her guardian ad litem, KAMA CONSTANCE FIELDS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by KAMA CONSTANCE FIELDS, an individual (Plaintiff); KARIMAH MUHAMMAD, a minor by and through her guardian ad litem, KAMA CONSTANCE FIELDS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by WILLIAM PENN VENTURES, LLC, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by KARIMAH MUHAMMAD, a minor by and through her guardian ad litem, KAMA CONSTANCE FIELDS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by KAMA CONSTANCE FIELDS, an individual (Plaintiff); KARIMAH MUHAMMAD, a minor by and through her guardian ad litem, KAMA CONSTANCE FIELDS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by KAMA CONSTANCE FIELDS, an individual (Plaintiff); KARIMAH MUHAMMAD, a minor by and through her guardian ad litem, KAMA CONSTANCE FIELDS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by KAMA CONSTANCE FIELDS, an individual (Plaintiff); KARIMAH MUHAMMAD, a minor by and through her guardian ad litem, KAMA CONSTANCE FIELDS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by KAMA CONSTANCE FIELDS, an individual (Plaintiff); KARIMAH MUHAMMAD, a minor by and through her guardian ad litem, KAMA CONSTANCE FIELDS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where William Penn Ventures, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CANADA RICHARD BRENT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FIELDS GARY D.